Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 5/25/2022 10:29:12 AM
Wednesday, January 5, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 12/17/2021 4:02 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Executive Session to discuss specific personnel matters in accordance with Section 3-305 of the General Provisions Article.

Board of Public Works
Created: 10/21/2021 1:04 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To reach livestream click here
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR)
Created: 12/29/2021 2:52 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Emergency Regulations: DLS Control No. 21237E
State Board of Education: State School Administration
Face Coverings in School Facilities:
COMAR 13A.01.07.01 through .06

Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority
Created: 12/27/2021 3:59 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Meeting Video
Phone Connection: 301-715-8592
Waiting Room Opens at 8:30 AM
Open Meeting of Full Authority + Closed Executive Session.

Senate Vaccine Oversight Workgroup
Created: 12/27/2021 9:36 AM
Monday, January 3, 2022 4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page