Day(s)
As of: 9/18/2024 4:25:39 PM
Created: 1/7/2022 4:39 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Organization Meeting followed by
Briefing on the Economy - Dan White, Director, Moody's Analytics
Created: 1/11/2022 4:07 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
10:45 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting
Canceled
Thursday, January 13, 2022
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing from Maryland Department of Health on Covid Vaccine spoilage.
Briefing from the Maryland Department of Health and the Department of Information Technology on the cybersecurity hack of MDH.
A vote to close: To discuss cybersecurity for which public discussion would constitute a risk to network security information.
Created: 1/3/2022 1:42 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Joint Hearing with the Health and Government Operations Committee
Briefing from the Maryland Department of Health and the Department of Information Technology on the cybersecurity hack of MDH.
A vote to close: To discuss cybersecurity for which public discussion would constitute a risk to network security information.
Briefing from Maryland Department of Health on Covid Vaccine spoilage.
Created: 1/6/2022 12:58 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Organizational Meeting
Created: 1/6/2022 12:58 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Chr FIN (Dept)
Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Sunset Extension
Chr FIN (Dept)
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension
Created: 1/5/2022 2:29 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
1:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
JPR Committee Organizational Meeting
Created: 1/5/2022 2:29 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Chr JPR (Dept)
Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Service Provider - Penalties
Chr JPR (Dept)
Evidence - Approval of Breath and Blood Tests for Alcohol, Drugs, or Controlled Dangerous Substances
Rules Discussion
Created: 1/3/2022 3:08 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
11:00 AM
-
Zoom / YouTube
11:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Organizational Meeting
Created: 1/11/2022 2:32 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Organizational Meeting
Created: 1/6/2022 3:28 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/6/2022 1:42 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Watson, et al
Condominiums – Disclosures to Unit Owners and Prohibited Provisions in Instruments
Del Holmes
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide
Del Holmes
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings
Created: 1/11/2022 12:39 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/6/2022 2:24 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Health and Government Operations Organizational Meeting
Created: 12/17/2021 1:06 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing from the Maryland Department of Health and the Department of Information Technology on the cybersecurity hack of MDH
Vote to close to discuss cybersecurity for which public discussion would constitute a risk to network security information
(Added - 12/22/2021 5:38 PM)
Briefing from Maryland Department of Health on Covid Vaccine spoilage
(Added - 12/31/2021 3:38 PM)
Briefing from MDH on Covid Vaccine spoilage
(Removed - 12/31/2021 3:38 PM)
Created: 1/7/2022 3:26 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Judiciary Committee Organizational Meeting
Created: 1/6/2022 1:59 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
12:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Organizational Meeting
Created: 1/4/2022 3:57 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Please Note: Testimony is SPONSOR ONLY.
(Added - 1/4/2022 3:59 PM)
(Added - 1/4/2022 3:59 PM)
Business Meeting/Work Session
A portion of the meeting may be held in Executive Session in accordance with Section 3-305 of the General Provisions Article.
Information and questions and answers from various organizations for members of the Eastern Shore Delegation and their constituents.
Weekly-Harford County House Delegation Meeting
Created: 1/6/2022 5:03 PM
Friday, January 14, 2022
10:00 AM
-
Zoom Meeting
9:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County.
Created: 12/16/2021 4:45 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Public virtual meeting to discuss normal IAC business.