Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor)
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Continuing the State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2025, the termination provisions relating to certain statutory and regulatory authority of the Commission; and requiring an independent evaluation of the Commission to be conducted under the supervision of the Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability in the Department of Legislative Services.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2021
Legislative Date
9/23/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2022
Legislative Date
1/06/2022
Action
Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {193021/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {233226/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hayes, Beidle and Ready)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hayes, Beidle and Ready)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Carey, Charkoudian and Howard)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Carey, Charkoudian and Howard)
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/23/2021 9/23/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension
Senate 1/06/2022 1/06/2022 Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {193021/1 Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Referred Economic Matters 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments {233226/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Senate Requests House Recede 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hayes, Beidle and Ready) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Senate Requests House Recede 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hayes, Beidle and Ready) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Refuses Recede 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Carey, Charkoudian and Howard) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 House Refuses Recede 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Carey, Charkoudian and Howard) 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/26/2022 12:10 PM
Click to return on the top page