Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/13/2024 3:45:35 PM
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 1/4/2023 4:25 PM
5:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
AIB Pillar 1 Advisory Committee
Meeting Video
To view the agenda and meeting materials click here
Discussion of recommendations on Draft Blueprint Comprehensive Plan.

Joint Committee on Cybersecurity, Information Technology and Biotechnology
Created: 12/16/2022 3:50 PM
1:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
The meeting will discuss cybersecurity issues for State and local governments including major cybersecurity legislation passed during the 2022 legislative session.

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 11/29/2022 9:41 AM
9:30 AM - UMBC Tech Center, Main Seminar Room, 1450 S. Rolling Road, Halethorpe, MD
9:30 AM - Anne Arundel Workforce Development Corp. Career Center, 631 Global Way, Linthicum Heights, MD
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 832 7872 2102 Passcode: 052236 Dial-In #: 301-715-8592
Members of the public wishing to attend in person are asked to register. There is no cost to attend. To register click here
Meeting of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports (Consortium)

Click to return on the top page