Day(s)
As of: 5/11/2025 4:55:52 AM
Created: 1/6/2023 1:06 PM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on the Economy
Created: 1/9/2023 12:47 PM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting
Created: 1/4/2023 12:06 PM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting
Created: 1/6/2023 11:26 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Committee Organizational Meeting
Canceled
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Briefing
1:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
OIS Briefing on the Senate Floor System
Created: 1/6/2023 11:26 AM
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/5/2023 10:46 AM
11:00 AM
-
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting
(Added - 1/12/2023 10:24 AM)
Created: 1/10/2023 2:15 PM
10:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting
Created: 1/3/2023 5:25 PM
10:30 AM
-
Zoom / YouTube
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/6/2023 10:22 AM
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting
Created: 1/6/2023 10:23 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Briefing: Overviews of Maryland Department of Health, Maryland Community Health Resources Commission, Maryland Health Care Commission, Maryland Health Services Cost Review Commission, and Maryland Institute of Emergency Medical Services Systems
Created: 1/11/2023 1:08 PM
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
House Judiciary Committee 2023 Organizational Meeting
Canceled
Ways and Means Committee
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting
Created: 1/10/2023 4:33 PM
1:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Organization Meeting
Created: 1/4/2023 4:32 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Monthly Board Meeting.
Weekly Harford County House Delegation Meeting.
Created: 1/11/2023 1:09 PM
8:30 AM - Miller Senate Building, Welcome Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Howard County House and Senate Delegations Meeting
Howard County Delegation Work Session.
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools