Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/19/2024 2:58:50 PM
Friday, January 12, 2024
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Anne Arundel
Created: 12/13/2023 9:53 AM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Anne Arundel County Delegation Meeting

Baltimore County
Created: 1/10/2024 10:38 AM
Briefing
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Maryland Air National Guard Presentation on the A-10 Warthog Retirement
Organization Business

Eastern Shore
Created: 12/28/2023 8:36 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Frederick
Created: 1/5/2024 12:40 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Montgomery
Created: 1/11/2024 12:10 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation.

Click to return on the top page