Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/5/2023 6:28:24 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
House
Created: 1/6/2022 2:24 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Health and Government Operations Organizational Meeting

Created: 12/17/2021 1:06 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing from the Maryland Department of Health and the Department of Information Technology on the cybersecurity hack of MDH
Vote to close to discuss cybersecurity for which public discussion would constitute a risk to network security information
(Added - 12/22/2021 5:38 PM)
Briefing from Maryland Department of Health on Covid Vaccine spoilage
(Added - 12/31/2021 3:38 PM)
Briefing from MDH on Covid Vaccine spoilage
(Removed - 12/31/2021 3:38 PM)

Click to return on the top page