Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/19/2024 3:03:18 PM
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
Senate
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/10/2024 10:37 AM
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on Federal Funding Opportunities for Climate Control and Transportation Infrastructure

Created: 1/8/2024 2:05 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Education Briefing - Agenda
For questions regarding this briefing, please contact Stacy Goodman at 410-841-3661.
(Added - 1/9/2024 12:01 PM)

Created: 1/8/2024 4:07 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Chr FIN (Dept)

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission – Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Chr FIN (Dept)

State Board of Dietetic Practice – Sunset Extension
Chr FIN (Dept)

State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Sunset Extension
Chr FIN (Dept)

State Acupuncture Board – Sunset Extension
Chr FIN (Dept)

Occupational Safety and Health Advisory Board – Sunset Extension

Created: 1/10/2024 7:41 AM
Finance Committee
1:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
ITO Overview of the Senate Floor System for members and staff

Created: 1/5/2024 3:53 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Briefing: Overview on the Juvenile Justice System
Agenda
Briefing Materials

House
Created: 1/5/2024 12:26 PM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on Maryland Department of Transportation’s Updated Consolidated Transportation Program

Created: 1/11/2024 10:33 AM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Electrification Impacts on the Maryland Electric Grid Agenda
Presentation

Created: 1/11/2024 10:33 AM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Clean Cars & Electric Vehicle Equipment/Equipment Programs in Maryland Agenda

Created: 1/11/2024 10:01 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Created: 1/11/2024 10:03 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Created: 1/10/2024 10:52 AM
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Overview
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Created: 1/10/2024 4:11 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Maryland Board of Nursing Review and Updates
Minority Business Enterprise Program

Created: 12/20/2023 10:07 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the State Department of Assessments and Taxation
Agenda

Briefing Materials

Other
No hearings scheduled for today
Click to return on the top page