Day(s)
As of: 5/11/2025 10:16:14 AM
Created: 1/10/2023 2:49 PM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
The agenda for the briefing can be found here
.
.
Briefing on Affordable Housing: Statewide and Local Partnerships
Created: 1/10/2023 2:14 PM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Overviews of Alcoholic Beverage Regulation and Medical Cannabis Implementation
Created: 1/6/2023 11:26 AM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/6/2023 11:26 AM
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/11/2023 12:12 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Department of Legislative Services Briefing on Budget Process
Created: 1/11/2023 4:23 PM
1:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Overview by the Workers’ Compensation Commission - Agenda
Created: 1/9/2023 1:45 PM
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by Maryland Environmental Service
(Added - 1/13/2023 11:30 AM)
Briefing by Maryland Association of Counties and Maryland Municipal League
(Added - 1/13/2023 11:30 AM)
Maryland Environmental Service
(Removed - 1/9/2023 1:56 PM)
Briefing by Maryland Environmental Service
(Removed - 1/9/2023 2:07 PM)
Created: 1/10/2023 1:16 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Insurance 101 and Introduction to the Maryland Insurance Administration and the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange
Created: 1/9/2023 1:06 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the State Board of Elections
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools