Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 5/21/2022 5:13:53 AM
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
House
Created: 1/7/2022 5:17 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing from the Office of Legislative Audits: Review of Certain Emergency Procurements Related to the State of Maryland’s COVID-19 Response

Created: 1/10/2022 2:43 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
HB0082 has been withdrawn via Sponsor
Del Crosby

General Provisions – Standard Time – Year–Round Daylight Saving Time
Del Carr

Procurement – Discriminatory Hiring Practices – Debarment
Del Carr

Public Information Act - Required Denials - Sociological Information and Distribution Lists
(Added - 1/12/2022 9:40 AM)
Del Bagnall

Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial
Del Hill

Department of General Services – Energy–Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2022)
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Appropriations)
Del Holmes

State Government - Notarial Acts - Fees
(Removed - 1/14/2022 12:23 PM)
Del Charkoudian

Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services and Public Safety Answering Points – Modifications
(Removed - 1/18/2022 10:51 AM)

Click to return on the top page