Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 5/21/2022 5:20:10 AM
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
House
Created: 1/4/2022 3:57 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Johnson

Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking
(Added - 1/5/2022 3:24 PM)
Del Luedtke

Income Tax – Determination of Taxable Income – Union Dues and Expenses to Influence Collective Bargaining
Del Crosby

Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - Exemption
(Removed - 1/7/2022 3:25 PM)

Created: 12/21/2021 7:54 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on the Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit and Tax Sales

Click to return on the top page