Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/19/2024 3:06:49 PM
Friday, January 19, 2024
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 1/5/2024 10:36 AM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Joint with the House Ways and Means Committee
Blueprint Implementation Update by AIB and MSDE

Created: 1/5/2024 11:12 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Blueprint Implementation Update by the Accountability & Implementation Board and the Maryland State Department of Education
Agenda

Briefing Materials

Other
Anne Arundel
Created: 12/13/2023 9:54 AM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Anne Arundel County Delegation Meeting

Baltimore County
Created: 1/16/2024 11:45 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing - Student Support Network Presentation
Bill Hearings - HB0058, HB0108, HB417
(Added - 1/18/2024 4:37 PM)
Bill Hearings - HB0058, HB0108
(Removed - 1/18/2024 4:37 PM)

Charles
Created: 1/17/2024 4:19 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Charles County Delegation Meeting

Eastern Shore
Created: 12/28/2023 8:37 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Frederick
Created: 1/16/2024 11:00 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Frederick County House and Senate Delegations Meeting

Program Approval Process Workgroup
Created: 1/11/2024 3:02 PM
10:15 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Final Recommendations

Southern Maryland
Created: 1/2/2024 11:57 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page