Day(s)
As of: 9/20/2024 5:49:25 PM
Sen Patterson
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Gaming Study - Use of Gaming Proceeds
Sen Eckardt
Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Sens McCray and Zucker
Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
Sen Ellis
Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Refund
Created: 1/18/2021 3:19 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
All bill hearings scheduled for today have been rescheduled. Please check January 26 and January 27 for new hearings. Only SB 1 has been rescheduled for January 21.
Even if you had already signed up to testify and/or upload your written testimony you will need to do so again.
Canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
11:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/6/2021 1:23 PM
11:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/6/2021 1:23 PM
1:15 PM to 2:45 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Education Briefing
Created: 12/29/2020 1:35 PM
2:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Bailey
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Electric Retractable Room Partitions - Operation Requirements
Sens Young and Feldman
Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act)
Sen Bailey
St. Mary's County - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Prohibition on Possession of Tobacco Products by Minors
Sen Kagan
State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
(Removed - 1/6/2021 1:18 PM)
(Removed - 1/6/2021 1:18 PM)
Sen Hester
Public Schools - Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course - Development, Implementation, and Reporting
(Removed - 1/20/2021 12:02 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept)
Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions
Chr FIN (Dept)
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements
Chr FIN (Dept)
Arts and Entertainment Districts – Artistic Work and Arts and Entertainment Enterprise – Definitions
Sen Benson
Health Insurance - Out-of-Pocket Maximums and Cost-Sharing Requirements - Calculation
Created: 1/18/2021 6:11 PM
Finance Committee
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
All bill hearings scheduled for today have been rescheduled. Those who signed up to testify and/or uploaded written testimony will need to do so on the rescheduled date.
Sens Lee and Waldstreicher
Criminal Law – Sexual Crimes – Repeal of Spousal Defense (Love Is No Defense to Sexual Crimes)
Sen Waldstreicher
Criminal Law - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Sens Waldstreicher and McCray
Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Operator - Penalties
Sens Waldstreicher and Carter
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Possession and Possession With Intent to Distribute
Sens Kagan and Reilly
Criminal Law - Public Safety - Interference With Agencies and Services - Prohibitions
Created: 1/4/2021 5:33 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Judiciary)
Del Washington
Maryland Higher Education Outreach and College Access Pilot Program - Alterations (Maryland College Access Act)
Oral testimony will be SPONSOR ONLY
Oral testimony will be SPONSOR ONLY
Oral testimony will be SPONSOR ONLY
Oral testimony will be SPONSOR ONLY
(Added - 1/4/2021 5:49 PM)
Del Korman
State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
(Added - 1/4/2021 5:49 PM)
Del P. Young
Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition - Exemption for Spouses and Dependents of Honorably Discharged Veterans
(Removed - 1/13/2021 9:51 AM)
Created: 12/29/2020 12:08 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 4:23 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Stewart
Environment – Application of Coal Tar Pavement Products – Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2021)
Del Boyce
Unlawful Taking of Oysters From Submerged Land Leases, Aquaculture Leases, and Water Column Leases – Penalties
Del Love
Environmental Justice - At-Risk Communities and Environmental Permits - Requirements
(Removed - 12/29/2020 3:23 PM)
Exact time of this subcommittee meeting will be announced after bill hearings are complete.
Created: 12/23/2020 4:47 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Final Bill Order Below
Del K. Young
Pharmacists - Administration of Self-Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
Del P. Young
Health Insurance - Out-of-Pocket Maximums and Cost-Sharing Requirements - Calculation
Del Sample-Hughes
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Created: 12/23/2020 9:47 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Judiciary)
The bill hearing for HB0072 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House last session.
Del Wilson
Education - Health and Safety of Students - Notification of Problematic Student Behavior
Del Wilson
Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
The bill hearing for HB0373 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House last session.
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Health and Government Operations)
Del Grammer
Baltimore County - Career Exploration and Development Activities in Public High Schools - Prohibiting a Ban or Regulation of Sale of Coffee
The bill hearing for HB0171 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House last session.
Del Ebersole
State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
The bill hearing for HB0237 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill almost identical to what was passed by the House last session
The bill hearing for HB0320 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House last session.
The bill hearing for HB0394 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House last session.
Del Wilkins
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
(Removed - 1/4/2021 12:59 PM)
Created: 1/14/2021 2:44 PM
9:30 AM to 10:30 AM - Google Meet Video Conference
Discuss initial recommendations and priorities during the legislative session.
Organizational Overview
Alcoholic Beverage Bills
Legislative Bond Initiatives
Legislative Bond Initiatives
Organizational Overview
Alcoholic Beverage Bills