Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 5/18/2022 4:16:53 PM
Thursday, January 20, 2022
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 1/17/2022 1:18 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Meeting Agenda
Meeting Minutes

Due to technical difficulties, the virtual meeting was not recorded. In lieu of the video, draft meeting minutes are available.
Business Meeting.

Carroll
Created: 1/13/2022 3:54 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Meeting of the Carroll County House and Senate Delegations
Election of Senate and House Delegation Chairs and Co-Chairs.
Voting on 2022 Legislation
Discussing Legislative Bond Initiatives.

Harford
Created: 1/10/2022 10:51 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Weekly-Harford County House Delegation Meeting

Legislative Policy Committee
Created: 1/10/2022 5:04 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
End of 2021 Interim Items

Montgomery
Created: 1/13/2022 8:12 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Economic Development Committee
Meeting Video
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Economic Development Committee.

No. 4 - Baltimore County
Canceled
3:30 PM to 4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore County Public School discussion with Superintendent Darryl Williams.

Click to return on the top page