Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 2/26/2021 1:43:30 AM
Friday, January 22, 2021
Senate
Created: 1/19/2021 4:50 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Voting Session
Thursday, January 21, 2021 4:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
3:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Sunset Extension
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Public Accountancy – Education Requirements – Obsolete References
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension
(Added - 1/19/2021 5:01 PM)
Sen Eckardt

Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
Chr EHE (Dept)

Maryland Military Department – Sale of Superfluous Armories
Chr EHE (Dept)

Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Leases
Chr EHE (Dept)

Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration
(Added - 1/20/2021 11:51 AM)

Click to return on the top page