Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 2/25/2021 11:58:19 PM
Friday, January 22, 2021
Other
Anne Arundel
Created: 1/9/2021 7:54 AM
Briefing
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Update from County Executive Steuart Pittman on Covid-19 and the County.

Baltimore City
Created: 1/15/2021 10:56 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Education briefing with Baltimore City Schools CEO, Dr. Sonja Santelises
(Added - 1/19/2021 6:19 PM)
Local Bill Hearings

Baltimore County
Created: 1/19/2021 5:41 PM
Briefing
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing: Baltimore County Multi-Year Improvement Plan for All Schools (MYIPAS)
(Joint Baltimore County House and Senate Delegations)
Bill Hearing (House Delegation only): HB4, HB253,HB348

Eastern Shore
Created: 1/14/2021 10:47 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.

Frederick
Created: 1/15/2021 3:24 PM
9:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Economic security update for Frederick County.

Montgomery
Created: 1/20/2021 7:54 AM
10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County.

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Created: 1/9/2021 8:20 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation with Baltimore City Stakeholders

Prince George's
Created: 1/12/2021 2:42 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Delegation Meeting

Southern Maryland
Created: 1/19/2021 3:48 PM
9:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Organizational Meeting

Click to return on the top page