Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 2/25/2021 11:49:08 PM
Friday, January 22, 2021
House
Created: 12/22/2020 4:44 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing by the State Board of Elections

Created: 1/20/2021 12:41 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Voting Session
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Some or all of these bills to be voted on.
Del Feldmark

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
Del Washington

State Department of Education - School Discipline - Data Collection
Del Smith

Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Transfer of Student Data - Modifications
Del Wilson

Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
Del Wilson

Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
Del Smith

Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition
Del Ebersole

State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
(Removed - 1/21/2021 1:45 PM)

Revenues Subcommittee - (Ways and Means Committee)
Created: 1/15/2021 12:25 PM
Revenues Subcommittee - Voting Session
12:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Feldmark

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
Del Wilson

Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund

Education Subcommittee - (Ways and Means Committee)
Canceled
Education Subcommittee
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Subcommittee Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/18/2021 12:31 PM
Education Subcommittee - Voting Session
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Washington

State Department of Education - School Discipline - Data Collection
Del Smith

Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Transfer of Student Data - Modifications
Del Wilson

Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
Del Smith

Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition
Del Ebersole

State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
(Removed - 1/21/2021 1:44 PM)

Click to return on the top page