Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 6/18/2024 9:12:21 AM
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
Senate
Created: 1/11/2023 12:53 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Fiscal Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services

Created: 1/17/2023 3:03 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Rosapepe

Maryland Saves Data Sharing Act
(Added - 1/20/2023 2:26 PM)
Sen Augustine (JtCMPF)

Bond Sales - Notification of the Public
Sen Augustine (Chr JtCMPF)

State Investment Portfolio - Investment Thresholds - Alterations
Sen Augustine

Equitable and Inclusive Transit-Oriented Development Enhancement Act
Prince George's County Senators

Prince George's County - Prince George's County Reentry Employment Incentive Program - Funding
(Added - 1/20/2023 2:26 PM)
Sen Pinsky, et al

State Finance – Prohibited Appropriations – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Sen Watson

Income Tax - Octogenarian Credit
(Added - 1/20/2023 2:26 PM)
Sen King

Education - Libraries - Funding
(Added - 1/20/2023 2:26 PM)
Sens Elfreth and Zucker

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Adoption Expenses - Alterations
Sen Elfreth, et al

Maryland State Arts Council - Funding
(Added - 1/20/2023 2:26 PM)
Sen Klausmeier

Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums (Long-Term Care Relief Act of 2023)
Sen Guzzone

Victim Services Programs - Supplementing Federal Funding and Support (Victim Services Stabilization Act)
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Judicial Proceedings)
Sens Guzzone and Salling

Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment Areas in Baltimore County - Sunset Extension
(Added - 1/20/2023 2:26 PM)
Sen Guzzone

Maryland School for the Blind - Public School Construction Program - Eligibility
(Added - 1/20/2023 2:26 PM)
Sen Kagan

Green and Renewable Energy for Nonprofit Organizations Loan Program and Fund
(Added - 1/20/2023 2:26 PM)

Created: 1/13/2023 10:37 AM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Hester

Maryland Food System Resiliency Council
Sen Hester

Department of Agriculture - State Ombudsman for Value-Added Agriculture
Sen Bailey

Department of Natural Resources – Documents – Digital or Electronic Issuance
Sen Bailey

Natural Resources – Blue and Flathead Catfish Finfish Trotline License – Establishment
Sen Bailey

Natural Resources – Apprentice Hunting License – Alterations
Sen Bailey

Natural Resources - Recreational Crabbing License - Exemption
Sen McCray

Baltimore City Soil Conservation District - Establishment - Requirements

Created: 1/13/2023 2:34 PM
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Health Occupations 101 (A briefing from the Maryland Department of Health and various health occupations boards)

Created: 1/16/2023 12:55 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Sydnor

Courts - Judgments - Exemptions From Execution
Sen Beidle

Circuit Courts and District Court - Dishonored Checks - Service Charges
Sen Brooks

Corporations and Associations – Annual Report Filing Fees – Electronic Filing Exemption
Sen Brooks

Execution on a Judgment – Child Support Arrearages – Workers’ Compensation
Sen Hettleman

Real Property – Actions to Repossess – Proof of Rental Licensure
Sen Ellis

Department of Planning - Collateral Consequences for Individuals With Criminal Records - Study
(Jointly assigned to Judicial Proceedings\Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Sen Sydnor

Motor Vehicles – Speed Limits – School Zones
Sen Rosapepe

Courts – Remote Public Access
Sens West and Waldstreicher

Corporations and Associations - Revisions
Sen Hayes

Real Property - Ground Rent Redemption Fund - Establishment
(Removed - 1/23/2023 10:53 AM)

House
Created: 1/11/2023 12:23 PM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Joint with the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Meeting Materials
Fiscal Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services

Created: 1/11/2023 12:28 PM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on State Employment
Briefing by Agencies on the Implementation on Federal Infrastructure Act and Inflation Reduction Act
(Added - 1/12/2023 4:36 PM)
Briefing by Agencies on the Implementation of the Federal Infrastructure Act
(Removed - 1/12/2023 4:36 PM)

Created: 1/24/2023 9:57 AM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
10:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Office of the Commissioner of Financial Regulation.
Online Data Privacy.

Created: 1/20/2023 12:16 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
1:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Office of the Attorney General
Consumer Protection Division

Created: 1/13/2023 12:36 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Briefing: Maryland Department of the Environment - Agency Overview and Update on the Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Agenda
MDE Overview
MCCC Update

Created: 1/10/2023 3:41 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Behavioral Health 101

Created: 1/17/2023 4:01 PM
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
- Handgun Qualification Licenses
- Wear and Carry
- Impact of New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc. v. Breun

Created: 1/17/2023 4:01 PM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
2:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
*Hearings will begin at 2:30pm or 15 minutes after the conclusion of the briefing, if the briefing concludes after 2:30pm*
Del Grammer

Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information
Del Grammer

Civil Actions - Civil Immunity - Educator Intervention
Del Wells

Workgroup to Study the Impact of Court-Mandated Fines and Fees
Del Rosenberg

Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Del Bartlett

Circuit Courts and District Court - Dishonored Checks - Service Charges
Del Bartlett

Maryland State Police Gun Center – Firearms Surrendered Under Final Protective Orders
Dels Moon and Clippinger

District Court - Small Claims - Enforcement of Money Judgments
Dels Moon and Williams

Court Proceedings - Remote Public Access and Participation

Created: 1/9/2023 1:13 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Bureau of Revenue Estimates
Agenda
Presentation

Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 1/6/2023 12:37 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach the livestream link click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Howard
Created: 1/20/2023 1:44 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Howard County House and Senate Delegations Meeting
Meeting Agenda
Delegation work session on Howard County local bills

Prince George's
Canceled
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
County Affairs Committee
Economic Development
County Government
All local and bi-county bills are assigned to one of the following committees for study and review before being voted on in the full House Delegation. The local committee then votes to make a recommendation to the full delegation.
The County Affairs Committee covers the following and related issue areas:

Click to return on the top page