Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/2/2023 10:30:02 AM
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
Senate
Created: 1/11/2023 12:53 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Fiscal Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services

Created: 1/17/2023 3:03 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Rosapepe

Maryland Saves Data Sharing Act
(Added - 1/20/2023 2:26 PM)
Sen Augustine (JtCMPF)

Bond Sales - Notification of the Public
Sen Augustine (Chr JtCMPF)

State Investment Portfolio - Investment Thresholds - Alterations
Sen Augustine

Equitable and Inclusive Transit-Oriented Development Enhancement Act
Prince George's County Senators

Prince George's County - Prince George's County Reentry Employment Incentive Program - Funding
(Added - 1/20/2023 2:26 PM)
Sen Pinsky, et al

State Finance – Prohibited Appropriations – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Sen Watson

Income Tax - Octogenarian Credit
(Added - 1/20/2023 2:26 PM)
Sen King

Education - Libraries - Funding
(Added - 1/20/2023 2:26 PM)
Sens Elfreth and Zucker

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Adoption Expenses - Alterations
Sen Elfreth, et al

Maryland State Arts Council - Funding
(Added - 1/20/2023 2:26 PM)
Sen Klausmeier

Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums (Long-Term Care Relief Act of 2023)
Sen Guzzone

Victim Services Programs - Supplementing Federal Funding and Support (Victim Services Stabilization Act)
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Judicial Proceedings)
Sens Guzzone and Salling

Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment Areas in Baltimore County - Sunset Extension
(Added - 1/20/2023 2:26 PM)
Sen Guzzone

Maryland School for the Blind - Public School Construction Program - Eligibility
(Added - 1/20/2023 2:26 PM)
Sen Kagan

Green and Renewable Energy for Nonprofit Organizations Loan Program and Fund
(Added - 1/20/2023 2:26 PM)

Click to return on the top page