Day(s)
As of: 4/24/2024 11:42:01 PM
Created: 1/5/2022 3:58 PM
11:30 AM
-
Zoom / YouTube
10:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/5/2022 3:58 PM
11:30 AM
-
Zoom / YouTube
10:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/5/2022 3:58 PM
11:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/26/2022 12:38 PM
9:30 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Guests - Steuart Pittman, County Executive and Dr. Kalyanaraman, Health Officer
Briefing: Baltimore County Executive Johnny Olszewski, Jr.
Bill Hearings: HB302, HB332, HB333
Information and questions and answers from various organizations for members of the Eastern Shore Delegation and their constituents.
Created: 1/19/2022 2:19 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Meeting Agenda
Members of the general public are invited to speak during the public comment portion of the meeting. Please request a Zoom link by 9:00 am on Wednesday at ken.kerr@house.state.md.us
You must specify the bill or bills you want to speak to or indicate that you want to make general public comment.
You will be given a participants' zoom link and admitted into the meeting when we reach that portion of the agenda. You will be invited to speak to the Delegation members for 2 minutes.
Members of the general public are invited to speak during the public comment portion of the meeting. Please request a Zoom link by 9:00 am on Wednesday at ken.kerr@house.state.md.us
You must specify the bill or bills you want to speak to or indicate that you want to make general public comment.
You will be given a participants' zoom link and admitted into the meeting when we reach that portion of the agenda. You will be invited to speak to the Delegation members for 2 minutes.
Voting on bills to be approved by Delegation.
(Added - 1/25/2022 2:36 PM)
Voting on bills to be approved by Delegation - detailed agenda will be forthcoming
(Removed - 1/25/2022 2:36 PM)
Discussion of Legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County.
Baltimore City Delegation Virtual Bill Hearing
SB157- Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners-Student Members and Task Force to Study Compensation (Sen.Carter)
(Added - 1/25/2022 4:13 PM)
SB249-Baltimore City-Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices- Local Laws Authorization (Sen. Hayes)
(Added - 1/25/2022 4:13 PM)
SB276-Baltimore City Public School Buildings-Notice of Demolition-Repeal (Sen. McCray)
(Added - 1/25/2022 4:13 PM)
Bi-weekly meeting of the Anne Arundel County Senate Delegation
Southern Maryland Delegation Organizational Meeting