Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 4/19/2021 9:06:17 AM
Monday, February 1, 2021
Senate
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/29/2021 10:38 AM
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Briefing
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on Personal Rapid Transit

Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting

Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting

Canceled
Executive Nominations Committee - Appearing
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Created: 1/29/2021 9:07 AM
Executive Nominations Committee - Appearing
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Airport Zoning Appeals, Board of
Michael S. Barranco, Esq., Baltimore County, District 42
Shelly L. Gardeniers, Anne Arundel County, District 30
Arts Council, Maryland State
David O. Fakunle, Ph.D., Baltimore City, District 45
Molline C. Jackson, Prince George's County, District 22
Elevator Safety Review Board
Lance R. Brown, Harford County, District 34
Edward M. Hord, Baltimore County, District 11
William D. Hosea, Anne Arundel County, District 33
Michael William Moran, Anne Arundel County, District 33
Robert F. "Sonny" Yeatman, Jr., Anne Arundel County, District 30
Nursing Home Administrators, State Board of Examiners of
Earl R. Runde, Kent County, District 36
Open Meetings Law Compliance Board, State
Jacob A. Altshuler, Esq., Baltimore City, District 41
Lynn M. Marshall, Esq., Howard County, District 9
Optometry, State Board of Examiners in
Rona D. Pepper, Baltimore County, District 11
Real Estate Commission, State
Michael W. Lord, Esq., Anne Arundel County, District 30
Michelle K. Wilson, Esq., Baltimore City, District 43
Tourism Development Board, Maryland
Heather A. Braue, Baltimore County, District 7
Juan Carlos Linares, Howard County, District 9
Albert A. Spence, Baltimore County, District 11

Created: 1/27/2021 11:15 AM
Executive Nominations Committee - Not Appearing
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Amusement Ride Safety Advisory Board
Gordon B. Trimper, Worcester County, District 38
Architects, State Board of
Mark R. Flemming, Calvert County, District 27
Automobile Insurance Fund, Board of Trustees of the Maryland
Glenda S. Beach, Anne Arundel County, District 33
Boiler Rules, Board of
Carey M. Dove, Howard County, District 9
John E. Dunnock, Out-of-State (PA)
Richard C. Ludlow, Anne Arundel County, District 31
Kevin J. Mulvey, Anne Arundel County, District 31
Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program Board
Sara C. Fidler, Esq., Baltimore City, District 41
Sudani Knowles, Prince George's County, District 21
Consumer Council
Monica Best-James, Esq., Prince George's County, District 23
Linda R. Dorsey-Walker, Baltimore County, District 11
Bridgette A. Greer, Esq., Prince George's County, District 23
Saif Rehman, Howard County, District 9
Infants and Toddlers, Interagency Coordinating Council for
Eric D. Ebersole, Baltimore County, District 12
Mai K. Hall, Howard County, District 9
Mary Jo Harris, Baltimore City, District 41
Mary Leonardi LaCasse, Baltimore County, District 42
Kristin Murphy, Harford County, District 35
David C. Rose, M.D., Howard County, District 12
Maryland School for the Blind, Board of Directors of the
Nancy S. Grasmick, Ph.D., Baltimore County, District 7
Brian Michael Ropp, Frederick County, District 4
Paul W. Schroeder, Montgomery County, District 18

Created: 1/7/2021 8:39 AM
Finance Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Fiscal Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services

House
Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Created: 1/29/2021 3:03 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Voting Session
4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Rogers

State Real Estate Commission - Property Managers - Registration
Del Williams

Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure
Del Qi

Corporations and Associations – Filing Fee Study

Other
Cecil
Created: 1/27/2021 1:53 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Local Bills and other legislation

Montgomery
Created: 1/27/2021 11:28 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Land Use, Transportation, and Public Safety Committee
Meeting Video
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation's Land Use, Transportation, and Public Safety Committee.

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Created: 1/25/2021 7:27 AM
6:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.

Senate Vaccine Oversight Workgroup
Created: 1/28/2021 8:40 AM
4:00 PM to 5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page