Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 3/22/2023 3:53:19 PM
Wednesday, February 1, 2023
House
Created: 1/17/2023 3:09 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
State of the Bay

Created: 1/19/2023 2:53 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Del Stewart

Private Well Safety Act of 2023
Del Stein

Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Board, Fees, and Penalties
Del Charkoudian

Maryland Food System Resiliency Council
Del Bagnall

Wetlands and Waterways - Riparian Rights - Voluntary Registry and Notice
(Removed - 1/30/2023 1:56 PM)

Click to return on the top page