Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 3/27/2023 4:21:11 AM
Wednesday, February 1, 2023
Senate
Created: 1/11/2023 12:46 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
2:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Lam, et al

Maryland Aviation Commission - Duties, Composition, and Member Orientation
(Added - 1/21/2023 7:15 PM)
Sen Jackson

State Highway Administration - Fallen Heroes Fishing Creek Bridge - Designation
(Added - 1/21/2023 7:15 PM)
Sen Carter

Equity in Transportation Sector - Guidelines and Analyses
Sen Augustine

Health Insurance – Annual Behavioral Health Wellness Visits – Coverage and Reimbursement
Sen Hester

Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Small Employers – Special Enrollment Period and Marketing
Sen Ellis

State Highway Administration - Litter Collection and Mowing
Sen Kramer

Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Telephone Solicitation (Stop the Spam Calls Act of 2023)
Sen Carter

Insurance and Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Treatment of Alopecia Areata – Coverage Requirements
(Removed - 1/25/2023 3:54 PM)

Click to return on the top page