Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 3/22/2023 2:51:07 PM
Wednesday, February 1, 2023
House
Created: 1/17/2023 4:01 PM
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
1:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
- Access to Counsel in Evictions (ACE) Task Force; January 2023 Report

Created: 1/17/2023 4:01 PM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
2:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
*As of 1:00pm on 2/1/2023, this hearing will now begin at 3:00pm*
Del Terrasa, et al

Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Electronic Filing and Signatures
(Added - 1/25/2023 8:55 AM)
Del Palakovich Carr, et al

Real Property - Limitations on Summoning Law Enforcement or Emergency Services - Prohibition
(Added - 1/25/2023 8:55 AM)
Del Cardin, et al

Courts – Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
(Added - 1/26/2023 9:35 AM)
Dels Atterbeary and Rosenberg

Civil Actions - Public Nuisances - Firearm Industry Members (Gun Industry Accountability Act of 2023)
(Added - 1/26/2023 9:35 AM)
Del Williams

Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Del Moon, et al

Firearms - Maryland Voluntary Do Not Sell Firearm Registry - Establishment
Del Moon

Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities
(Added - 1/20/2023 1:15 PM)
Del Charles, et al

Foreclosure Proceedings - Residential Mortgagors and Grantors - Access to Counsel
(Added - 1/25/2023 8:55 AM)
Del Grammer

Firearms - Right to Purchase, Own, Possess, and Carry - Medical Cannabis (Maryland Constitutional Carry Act)
(Removed - 1/20/2023 9:04 AM)

Click to return on the top page