Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 3/27/2023 12:22:40 AM
Wednesday, February 1, 2023
Other
Howard
Created: 1/28/2023 7:23 AM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Howard County House and Senate Delegations Meeting
Meeting Agenda
Howard County Delegation and Howard County Senators work session on local legislation

Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board
Created: 1/17/2023 3:07 PM
10:00 AM to 12:00 PM - 1746 World Trade Center, 401 East Pratt St. Baltimore, MD
The Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board will meet to discuss issues pertaining to the life sciences and medical technology communities.

Prince George's
Created: 1/9/2023 4:30 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
County Affairs Committee
All local and bi-county bills are assigned to one of the following committees for study and review before being voted on in the full House Delegation. The local committee then votes to make a recommendation to the full delegation.
The County Affairs Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
County Government
Economic Development

Click to return on the top page