Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/13/2024 2:49:57 PM
Friday, February 2, 2024
Senate
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/10/2024 3:55 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Or immediately following session.

Health and Human Services Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/10/2024 3:55 PM
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Or immediately following session.

Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/10/2024 3:55 PM
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Or immediately following session.

Created: 1/19/2024 10:02 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
10:30 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen West

Regulated Firearms - Department of State Police - Reporting Requirements
Sen McCray

Handgun Permits - Accidental Discharge and Training Requirements - Maryland State Police Gun Center (Firearm Safety Act of 2024)
Sen Salling

Criminal Law - Display of Obscene Material to Minors - Prohibition
Sen McKay

Firearms - Right to Purchase, Own, Possess, and Carry
(Added - 1/30/2024 1:57 PM)
Sen Waldstreicher

Criminal Law – Theft – Mail and Mail Depository Key
Sens Kelly and Carozza

Criminal Law - Sexual Extortion, Stalking, and Revenge Porn - Statute of Limitations and In Banc Review
Sen Folden, et al

Criminal Procedure - Stops and Searches - Cannabis Odor and Admission of Evidence (Drug-Free Roadways Act of 2024)
Sen West, et al

Criminal Procedure - Incarcerated Seniors - Motion to Reduce the Duration of a Sentence
Sen West, et al

Criminal Law - Theft of a Handgun
(Removed - 1/25/2024 4:16 PM)
Sen Smith

Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances and Firearms
(Removed - 1/29/2024 1:47 PM)
Sen West

Estates and Trusts - Appointment of Personal Representative - Objections
(Removed - 1/29/2024 1:54 PM)
Sen Watson

Criminal Law - First-Degree Assault - Assault With a Firearm
(Removed - 1/31/2024 4:15 PM)

Created: 1/30/2024 12:23 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
9:00 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

House
Created: 2/1/2024 11:41 AM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
11:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Chr HGO (Dept)

Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Dental Coverage
(Added - 2/1/2024 7:04 PM)
Chr HGO (Dept)

Health Insurance – Conformity With Federal Law
(Added - 2/1/2024 7:04 PM)
Del Pruski

Maryland Commission on Veterans and Military Families
(Added - 2/1/2024 7:04 PM)
Del Bouchat, et al

Commission to Study African American Civil War Soldiers in Maryland
(Added - 2/1/2024 7:04 PM)
Chr HGO (Dept)

State Government - Information Technology - Major Information Technology Development Projects
(Added - 2/1/2024 7:04 PM)
Chr HGO (Dept)

Physicians and Allied Health Professions - Reorganization and Revisions
(Added - 2/1/2024 7:04 PM)
Chr HGO (Dept)

Department of Natural Resources - Pay-For-Success Contracts - Procurement Exemption
(Added - 2/1/2024 7:04 PM)

Other
Anne Arundel
Created: 12/13/2023 10:39 AM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Anne Arundel County Delegation Meeting

Baltimore County
Created: 1/30/2024 10:59 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing: Baltimore County Public Schools Superintendent, Dr. Myriam Rogers
Bill Hearings: HB0495, HB741
(Added - 1/31/2024 1:34 PM)
Bill Voting: HB0058, HB0417
Bill Hearings: HB0495
(Removed - 1/31/2024 1:34 PM)

Cecil
Created: 1/25/2024 12:15 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Local Bond Initiatives
Local Delegation Bills

Charles
Created: 1/25/2024 3:29 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Charles County Delegation

Eastern Shore
Created: 12/28/2023 8:39 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Frederick
Created: 1/16/2024 11:02 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Frederick County House and Senate Delegations Meeting

Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR)
Created: 1/26/2024 1:56 PM
9:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Emergency Regulations, DLS Control No. 23-312E

Rate Setting and Complaint Resolution for Police Initiated Towing and Recovery Committee
Created: 2/1/2024 7:38 AM
1:00 PM to 4:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Meeting Video
To join by phone: (US) +1 314-666-2967 PIN: 331 829 010#
Meeting Agenda

Southern Maryland
Created: 1/2/2024 11:58 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page