Day(s)
As of: 5/9/2025 5:09:26 AM
Created: 1/6/2023 1:06 PM
11:30 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Or immediately following session.
Created: 1/6/2023 1:06 PM
11:30 AM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Or immediately following session.
Created: 1/6/2023 1:06 PM
11:30 AM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Or immediately following session.
Created: 1/10/2023 2:14 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
HB0078
Anne Arundel County House Delegation Meeting
(Added - 1/17/2023 11:37 AM)
Anne Arundel County Delegation Meeting
(Removed - 1/17/2023 11:37 AM)
Briefing-Tradepoint Atlantic
Local Bill Hearings: HB348,
(Added - 2/2/2023 10:02 AM)
Bill Votes: HB166, HB175, HB210, HB222, and HB248
Local Bill Hearings: HB348, HB381
(Removed - 2/2/2023 10:02 AM)
Various Topics
Weekly Scheduled Frederick County Delegation Meeting.
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation
Created: 2/2/2023 3:07 PM
8:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Prince George's County House Delegation Meeting
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools