Day(s)
As of: 5/13/2025 9:04:28 AM
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 1/19/2021 4:13 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
The Committee will break from 12:30 to 1:30 p.m.
Sen Carter
Election Law - Registered Voter List Security and Electronic Signature Requirements for Petitions
Sen Edwards, et al
Maryland Public Ethics Law - Retaliation for Reporting or Participating in Investigation - Prohibition
Sen Kramer
Election Law - Voting - Elections by Mail, Polling Places, and Early Voting Centers
Sen Sydnor
Legislative Department - Eligibility to Serve as Senators and Delegates - Place of Abode
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Judicial Proceedings)
Sen McCray
Campaign Finance - For-Profit Substance Abuse and Mental Health Treatment Providers - Disclosure of Contributions
Sen Kagan
Campaign Finance - Special Session of the General Assembly - Contributions Prohibited
Sen Patterson
Labor and Employment - Hiring - Higher Education Requirements (Give Me a Chance Act)
Sen Corderman
Health Facilities – Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs – Essential Caregivers
Sens Hester and Hayes
Maryland Department of Health – Residential Service Agencies – Training Requirements
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Kramer
State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Applicability, Bargaining Processes, and Memorandums of Understanding
Sen Kelley, et al
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
(Jointly assigned to Judicial Proceedings\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Lam
Crimes - Mitigation - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sen Sydnor
Criminal Procedure – Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight
(Added - 1/29/2021 12:36 PM)
(Added - 1/31/2021 12:52 PM)
(Added - 1/29/2021 12:36 PM)
Sen Smith
Office of the Attorney General – Investigation and Prosecution of Deaths Caused by Police Officers
(Added - 1/29/2021 12:36 PM)
(Removed - 1/21/2021 8:44 AM)
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/3/2021 5:10 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 2/3/2021 6:09 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Voting on HB65
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/18/2021 2:53 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 1/20/2021 3:31 PM)
Del Korman
Public Utilities – Office of Climate Counsel – Establishment (Climate Counsel Act)
Del Qi
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
(Added - 1/20/2021 3:31 PM)
(Added - 1/20/2021 3:31 PM)
(Added - 1/20/2021 3:31 PM)
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County - Interference With Electric Company's Vegetation Management Compliance - Exemption MC 10-21
(Removed - 2/3/2021 10:55 AM)
Created: 2/2/2021 12:23 PM
12:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/19/2021 4:02 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Removed - 2/3/2021 9:21 PM)
Created: 1/31/2021 3:32 PM
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/21/2021 10:32 AM
5:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Time of subcommittee meeting will be announced after Bill Hearings are complete
Created: 12/23/2020 4:47 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Final bill order below
Del Lierman
Procurement – Specialized Printing Services Contracts – Board of Public Works Approval
Del Bhandari
State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Temporary Licenses to Practice Physical Therapy and Limited Physical Therapy
Del Krebs
Naturopathic Doctors - Formulary Council Membership, Formulary Content, and Scope of Practice
Del Cullison
Catastrophic Health Emergencies – Health Care Providers – Definition and Immunity (Maryland Health Care Heroes Protection Act)
(Removed - 1/7/2021 3:20 PM)
Created: 1/15/2021 4:18 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Bills are ordered as they appear below. All bills will be given three (3) minutes to the sponsor and two (2) minutes for each witness.
Del Valentino-Smith
Child Abuse and Neglect - Memorandum of Understanding With Military Family Advocacy Program
(Added - 1/22/2021 12:55 PM)
(Added - 1/18/2021 6:30 PM)
(Added - 1/18/2021 6:30 PM)
Created: 1/18/2021 2:13 PM
1:30 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The Spkr (Admin)
Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Economic Matters)
(Added - 1/21/2021 9:19 AM)
Dels Lierman and Korman
Board of Revenue Estimates and Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Organization and Operations
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Appropriations)
Del Palakovich Carr
Income Tax - Internal Revenue Code Amendments and the Federal CARES Act - Decoupling
Del Buckel
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit - Certified Historic Structure and Single-Family, Owner-Occupied Residence - Definitions
The bill hearing for HB0539 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House during the last session.
Cecil County Delegation
Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas
Bill hearings on local bills for the 2021 session will be sponsor only.
(Added - 1/21/2021 9:19 AM)
(Added - 1/22/2021 11:09 AM)
Bill hearings on local bills for the 2021 session will be sponsor only.
(Added - 1/18/2021 4:42 PM)
The bill hearing for HB0546 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House during the last session.
(Added - 1/20/2021 10:35 AM)
(Added - 1/20/2021 10:35 AM)
Del Rosenberg
Election Law – Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems – Notification and Termination of Contract
Del Rosenberg
Election Law – Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems – Notification and Termination of Contract
Del McKay
Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force
(Added - 2/3/2021 8:21 AM)
Del Boyce
Property Tax Credit - Urban Agricultural Property - Repeal of Repayment Requirement
(Added - 2/3/2021 8:21 AM)
Harford County Delegation Meeting
Delegation Meeting
(Added - 2/3/2021 8:27 PM)
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools