Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/13/2024 3:17:16 PM
Monday, February 19, 2024
Senate
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/10/2024 3:55 PM
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD

Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/10/2024 3:55 PM
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD

House
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 1/4/2024 2:15 PM
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Health and Social Services Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 1/4/2024 3:02 PM
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 150, Annapolis, MD

Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 1/4/2024 2:39 PM
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD

Capital Budget Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 1/4/2024 3:38 PM
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/11/2024 1:12 PM)
Department of Juvenile Services PAYGO
(Removed - 1/11/2024 1:12 PM)
Department of Aging
(Removed - 1/17/2024 4:41 PM)
Maryland Department of Emergency Management
(Removed - 1/17/2024 4:41 PM)
Department of Planning
(Removed - 2/16/2024 2:39 PM)
St Mary's College of Maryland
(Removed - 2/16/2024 2:39 PM)

Created: 1/11/2024 10:33 AM
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Dels Taveras and Ruth

Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications - Residency Requirements
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Nonprofit Organizations PG 304-24
(Added - 1/24/2024 10:56 AM)
Dels Addison and Young

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - B-D-7 Licenses - Hours of Sale
(Added - 1/18/2024 12:20 PM)
Del Ghrist, et al

Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
(Added - 1/18/2024 12:20 PM)
Del Ghrist, et al

Caroline County – Alcoholic Beverages – Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License
(Added - 1/18/2024 12:20 PM)
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Lounge License PG 303-24
(Added - 1/24/2024 10:56 AM)
Del Otto

Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Veterans' Organization or Club License
(Added - 1/24/2024 10:56 AM)
Frederick County Delegation

Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Weinberg Center/New Spires Arts Stages Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
(Added - 1/24/2024 10:56 AM)
Frederick County Delegation

Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Limited Beer, Wine, and Liquor Permit
(Added - 1/24/2024 10:56 AM)
Frederick County Delegation

Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Municipal Golf Course License
(Added - 1/24/2024 10:56 AM)
Dels S. Johnson and A. Johnson

Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee
(Added - 1/29/2024 12:10 PM)
Harford County Delegation

Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License
(Added - 1/29/2024 12:10 PM)
Harford County Delegation

Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Golf Simulator Facility
(Added - 1/29/2024 12:10 PM)
Harford County Delegation

Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
(Added - 1/29/2024 12:10 PM)
Harford County Delegation

Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Performing Arts Nonprofit Organization License
(Added - 1/29/2024 12:10 PM)
Del Jackson

Alcoholic Beverages – Sale or Delivery for Off–Premises Consumption
(Added - 2/1/2024 9:28 AM)
St. Mary's County Delegation

St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting Permit
(Added - 2/1/2024 9:28 AM)
St. Mary's County Delegation

St. Mary’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – Nonprofit Performing Arts Theater License
(Added - 2/1/2024 9:28 AM)
Baltimore City Delegation

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licensing Fees
(Added - 1/31/2024 8:59 AM)
Frederick County Delegation

Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License
(Added - 2/1/2024 9:28 AM)
Frederick County Delegation

Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's License
(Added - 2/1/2024 9:28 AM)
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Off-Premises Consumption MC 9-24
(Added - 2/1/2024 9:28 AM)
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class D Beer and Wine License – Farm Breweries and Limited Wineries MC 17–24
(Added - 2/1/2024 9:28 AM)
Del Atterbeary

Alcoholic Beverages – Retail Delivery – Local Delivery Service Permit
(Added - 2/1/2024 9:28 AM)
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Renewal PG 308-24
(Added - 2/1/2024 9:28 AM)
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of License Near a Place of Worship or School PG 307-24
(Added - 2/1/2024 9:28 AM)
Del Amprey

Alcoholic Beverages - Class A License - Food Retailers
(Added - 2/2/2024 1:33 PM)
Washington County Delegation

Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
(Added - 2/2/2024 1:33 PM)
Del Clippinger, et al

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 46th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions
(Added - 2/8/2024 10:41 AM)
Del Pruski

Alcoholic Beverages - Class 4 Limited Winery License - Requirements and Authorizations
(Added - 2/8/2024 10:41 AM)
Del Clippinger (BCA)

Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License – Downtown Management District
(Added - 2/8/2024 10:41 AM)
Harford County Delegation

Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Performing Arts Theater License
(Added - 2/8/2024 10:41 AM)
Del Amprey

Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – 40th Alcoholic Beverages District – Revisions
(Added - 2/8/2024 10:41 AM)
Allegany County Delegation

Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BWLT Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting Permit
(Added - 2/8/2024 10:41 AM)
Del Kerr

Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery and Direct Shipment
(Added - 2/8/2024 10:41 AM)
Dels Addison and Young

Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – License Extensions
(Added - 2/8/2024 10:41 AM)
Del Ebersole

Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications - Online Notice
(Added - 2/8/2024 10:41 AM)
Allegany County Delegation

Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Underage Employees
(Added - 2/9/2024 3:32 PM)
Del Anderton

Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Monopoly of Liquor Control Board and Dispensary - Repeal
(Added - 2/9/2024 3:32 PM)
Del Anderton

Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses - Purchases From Licensed Wholesalers and Self-Distribution
(Added - 2/9/2024 3:32 PM)
Del Pippy

Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Brewery and Distillery Licenses
(Added - 2/9/2024 3:32 PM)
Del Fraser-Hidalgo

Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A Licenses
(Added - 2/9/2024 3:32 PM)
Del Griffith

Cecil County and Harford County - Outdoor Seating at Restaurants, Breweries, and Bars
(Removed - 2/19/2024 9:52 AM)

Public Safety Subcommittee - (Judiciary Committee)
Created: 2/15/2024 2:21 PM
Public Safety Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Guyton, et al

Public Safety - Missing Persons With Cognitive Impairment - Purple Alert Program
Dels Grammer and Bartlett

Crimes - Interception of Wire, Oral, or Electronic Communications - Exception for Imminent Danger
Del Attar

Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Machine Gun in the Commission or Attempted Commission of a Felony

Other
No. 4 - Baltimore County
Created: 2/16/2024 3:33 PM
3:30 PM - Miller Senate Building, Welcome Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD

Click to return on the top page