Day(s)
As of: 5/13/2025 5:29:42 AM
Canceled
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
MSDE Funding for Educational Organizations
Aid to Community Colleges
Created: 1/13/2021 5:02 PM
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
(Added - 1/25/2021 11:39 AM)
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 2/18/2021 8:32 AM
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Please note that portions of the meeting may be closed in accordance with Open Meetings Act procedures.
African American History and Culture, Commission on
Torrey J. Snow, Anne Arundel County, District 21
Handgun Roster Board
Jennifer Gill, Baltimore County, District 12
Health Care Commission, Maryland
Bimbola F. Akintade, Ph.D., Prince George's County, District 23
Trumpti N. Brahmbhatt, Ph.D., Montgomery County, District 14
Higher Education Commission, Maryland
Lewis R. Brown, Ed.D., Montgomery County, District 14
Sydney Miller, Baltimore County, District 42
Labor Relations Board, State
Olivia D. Vaughns, Prince George's County, District 24
Longitudinal Data System Center Governing Board, Maryland
Maurice A. Good, Baltimore City, District 40
Susan M. Sterett, Ph.D., Baltimore City, District 46
Morgan State University Board of Regents
Burney J. Hollis, Ph.D., Baltimore City, District 43
Tracey Parker-Warren, Esq., Anne Arundel County, District 21
Carl W. Turnipseed, Out-of-State (NY)
Marquis T. Walker, Ph.D., Out-of-State (VA)
Winston A. Wilkinson, Anne Arundel County, District 21
Retirement and Pension Systems, Board of Trustees for the Maryland State
James P. Daly, Jr., Anne Arundel County, District 31
St. Mary's College of Maryland, Board of Trustees
Douglass V. Mayer, Anne Arundel County, District 30
Harry J. Weitzel, St. Mary's County, District 29
Created: 2/18/2021 8:33 AM
Executive Nominations Committee - Not Appearing
5:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Budget of the State Workers' Compensation Commission, Advisory Committee on the
Nathan J. Cavey, Jr., Howard County, District 9
Michael G. Comeau, Harford County, District 35
Carmine G. D'Alessandro, Esq., Baltimore County, District 7
Sandra I. Dorsey, St. Mary's County, District 29
Melinda L. Hayes, Baltimore County, District 5
Heather H. Kraus, Esq., Anne Arundel County, District 33
Adrienne M. Ray, Baltimore County, District 10
Lisa Y. Settles, Esq., Baltimore County, District 42
Matthew D. Trollinger, Esq., Charles County, District 28
College of Southern Maryland, Board of Trustees of the
Jose M. Gonzalez, Charles County, District 28
Seafood Marketing Advisory Commission
Kyle D. Gilbert, Anne Arundel County, District 30
Jordan T. Todd, Dorchester County, District 37
Social Work Examiners, State Board of
Barbara G. Gassaway, Baltimore County, District 7
Veterans' Home Commission, Maryland
Luis A. Hernandez, Ph.D., Prince George's County, District 23
Veterinary Medical Examiners, State Board of
Elizabeth Callahan, D.V.M., Talbot County, District 37
Karena Joung, V.M.D., Baltimore City, District 46
James Reed, D.V.M., Anne Arundel County, District 30
Waterworks and Waste Systems Operators, State Board of
Rosann Ndebumadu, Prince George's County, District 23
Partha V. Tallapragada, Harford County, District 7
Benjamin Thompson, Carroll County, District 5
Youth Camp Safety Advisory Council
Neil S. Berlin, Baltimore County, District 10
Margaret S. Harris, Anne Arundel County, District 33
Jed Miller, M.D., Out-of-State (PA)
Allegany College Board of Trustees
Joyce K. Lapp, Allegany County, District 1
Anne Arundel Community College Board of Trustees
Briana R. Barone, Anne Arundel County, District 31
Calvert County Board of Electrical Examiners and Supervisors
Ludwig Baumann, Calvert County, District 27
Calvert County Board of License Commissioners
Steven R. Jones, Calvert County, District 29
Calvert County Plumbing Board
Paul C. Hayden, Jr., Calvert County, District 27
Frederick M. Wyrostek, Calvert County, District 27
Caroline County Board of Education
Kathy S. Dill, Caroline County, District 36
Arevia M. Wayman, Caroline County, District 36
Cecil College Board of Trustees
Raymond W. Hamm, Jr., Cecil County, District 36
Dorchester County Board of Elections
William E. Batson, Dorchester County, District 37
Thomas M. Corkran, Dorchester County, District 37
Michael W. Detmer, Dorchester County, District 37
Ralph C. Lewis, Jr., Dorchester County, District 37
Robin A. Willey, Dorchester County, District 37
Frederick Community College Board of Trustees
Thomas E. Lynch, III, Esq., Frederick County, District 3
Frederick County Board of License Commissioners
Christopher D. Glass, Sr., Frederick County, District 4
Howard Community College Board of Trustees
Carl S. Perkins, Ed.D., Howard County, District 12
Felicita Sola-Carter, Howard County, District 9
St. Mary's County Board of License Commissioners
Richard D. Watts, St. Mary's County, District 29
David LeRoy Willenborg, St. Mary's County, District 29
Talbot County Orphans' Court
John F. Hall, Esq., Talbot County, District 37
Washington County Orphans' Court
James R. Nipps, Washington County, District 2
Wicomico County Board of Elections
Sharon A. Morris, Wicomico County, District 37
Katrina Purnell, Wicomico County, District 37
Wicomico County Board of License Commissioners
Carolyn Hall, Wicomico County, District 38
G. Allen Hudson, Wicomico County, District 37
Wor-Wic Community College Board of Trustees
Morgan Hazel, Wicomico County, District 37
Anna Giles Newton, Worcester County, District 38
Worcester County Board of License Commissioners
Martha W. Pusey, Worcester County, District 38
Created: 2/21/2021 12:31 PM
11:00 AM
-
Virtual Meeting
12:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Police Reform
Created: 2/21/2021 12:31 PM
4:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
MSDE Funding for Educational Organizations
Aid to Community Colleges
Created: 1/13/2021 5:02 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 1/25/2021 11:39 AM)
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/19/2021 5:51 PM
4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Henson
Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Handwashing Facilities on Construction Sites
Del Love
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Del Pena-Melnyk
Commercial Law – Retail Transactions – Cash Payments (Cash Transactions Preservation Act)
Del Qi
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Del D.M. Davis
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Financial Capabilities and Legal Assistance Fund
Del Carey
Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Created: 2/18/2021 1:07 PM
2:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/18/2021 9:59 PM
3:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/19/2021 1:36 PM
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del K. Young
Pharmacists - Administration of Self-Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
Del Hill, et al
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2021)
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Appropriations)
Del Shetty
Pharmacists - Required Notification and Authorized Substitution - Lower-Cost Drug or Device Product
Del R. Lewis
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Prophylaxis Care and Oral Health Exams
Created: 2/10/2021 10:11 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Bills are ordered as they appear below. Each bill sponsor will receive three (3) minutes to provide oral testimony while each witness will receive two (2) minutes to provide oral testimony.
Del Hill
Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act – Assistance With Governmental Benefits and Programs
Del W. Fisher
Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Payment of Commissions and Attorney’s Fees
- HB 670
Created: 2/17/2021 9:29 AM
9:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Bills are ordered as they appear below
Del Crosby
Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission - Atlantic Menhaden - Population Evaluation and Prohibition on Commercial Reduction Fishing
Del Malone
Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts)
Local Bill Hearings and Voting Session
Frederick County Delegation Meeting
Subject: TBD
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Metro Washington Area Committee.
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools