Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 3/5/2021 9:41:54 PM
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
House
Created: 2/4/2021 12:54 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Final bill order below.
The Spkr (Admin)

Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements
Del Pena-Melnyk

COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Appropriations)
Del Rosenberg

Maryland Department of Health – COVID–19 Vaccination Plan
(Added - 2/11/2021 11:06 AM)
Del Mangione

Emergency Medical Services - Paramedics - Vaccination Administration
(Added - 2/11/2021 11:06 AM)
Del Cullison

Maryland Department of Health - 2-1-1 Maryland - Mental Health Services Phone Call Program
Del Charles

Sheila E. Hixson Behavioral Health Services Matching Grant Program for Service Members and Veterans - Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Appropriations)
Del Chang

Public Health - Cottage Food Businesses - Annual Revenues
Del Bartlett

Public Health – Chief Medical Examiner – Autopsy Findings and Conclusions
Del Queen

Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Ways and Means)
Del Bagnall

Local Health Departments and Community Action Agencies – Feminine Hygiene Products
Del Queen

Public Health – Adverse Childhood Experience Screening – Requirement and Practitioner Training Program
(Removed - 2/4/2021 4:00 PM)
Del D. Jones

Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor – Administration of Vaccinations
(Removed - 2/18/2021 9:31 AM)

Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 2/22/2021 10:44 AM
Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee - Work Session
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
HB 123

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 2/19/2021 5:01 PM
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Work Session
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
-HB 611, 643, 689

Click to return on the top page