Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 3/5/2021 9:31:49 PM
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
House
Created: 1/31/2021 9:37 AM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Bills are ordered as they appear below. Each bill sponsor will receive three (3) minutes to provide oral testimony while each witness will receive two (2) minutes to provide oral testimony.
Del Grammer

Law Enforcement Performance Measurements - Required Reporting
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:11 AM)
Del Barron

Workgroup to Study Partial Expungement
Del Smith

Baltimore City – Police Officers – Promotional Appointments
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:11 AM)
Del Washington

Public Safety – Law Enforcement Officer – Data Collection and Reporting
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:11 AM)
Del Shetty

Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties - Alterations
Del Shetty

Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight
Del W. Fisher, et al

Criminal Procedure - Probation Before Judgment - Facts Justifying a Finding of Guilt and Suspension of Sentence
Del Pippy

Criminal Procedure – Expungement – Entitlement
Del Ruth

Corrections - Restrictive Housing - Serious Mental Illness
Del Cox

Criminal Procedure - Registered Sex Offenders - Residency Restrictions
Del Wells

Criminal Procedure - Automatic Expungement
Del Acevero

Johns Hopkins University - Police Department - Repeal
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:11 AM)
Del Ivey

Private Institutions of Higher Education - Police Departments - Repeal and Prohibition
(Added - 2/11/2021 9:26 AM)
Del McComas

Court Officials - Public Disclosure of Personal Information
(Removed - 2/2/2021 12:09 PM)
Del Atterbeary

Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program
(Removed - 2/2/2021 12:09 PM)
Del Queen

Courts - Judgments - Exemptions from Execution
(Removed - 2/2/2021 12:09 PM)
Del Hartman

Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law)
(Removed - 2/2/2021 12:09 PM)
Del R. Watson

Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals – Renaming
(Removed - 2/2/2021 12:09 PM)

Click to return on the top page