Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 2/25/2021 3:55:32 AM
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
House
Created: 2/10/2021 9:03 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Crosby

Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Number Required
Del Wilkins

Mail–In Voting Enhancement Act
Del Wilkins

Election Law - Permanent Absentee Ballot List
Del Feldmark

Election Law – Absentee Ballot Canvassing – Multiple Ballots Cast by an Individual
Del Kaiser

Election Law - Prohibition of Solicitation to Commit Election Crime
Del Hill

Real Property – Transfer to Heir – Exemption From Prepayment of Taxes
Del Rosenberg

Tax Sales – Notices
Del Kerr

Property Tax Credit – Business Entities – State of Emergency
Del Feldmark

Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion to Additional Offices
Del Attar

Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Activities That Promote Health and Physical Well-Being
Del Shoemaker

State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Application of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemption
The bill hearing for HB0815 will be sponsor only as a reintroduced bill identical to what was passed by the House during the last session.
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:26 AM)
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction PG 413-21
Bill hearings on local bills for the 2021 session will be sponsor only.
Sen King

Income Tax - Child Tax Credit and Expansion of the Earned Income Credit
Witness sign up for SB 218 will be open Monday, February 22 from 8:00 a.m. until 3:00 p.m. As per Ways and Means Committee Witness Guidelines, the oral testimony time limit per witness may be reduced if there are 30-50 witnesses signed up
(Added - 2/19/2021 4:58 PM)
Del Impallaria

Election Law – State Officials – Recall Election
(Removed - 2/10/2021 9:07 PM)
Del Williams

Election Law – Curbside Voting – Establishment
(Removed - 2/10/2021 9:07 PM)
Del M. Fisher

Election Law - Websites - Reporting of Political Censorship
(Removed - 2/10/2021 9:07 PM)
Del Arentz

Election Law - Voter Registration List - Right to Nondisclosure of Personal Information
(Removed - 2/10/2021 9:07 PM)
Del Palakovich Carr

State Board of Elections – Membership, Contract Management, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Voting System Financing
(Removed - 2/10/2021 9:10 PM)
Del Rosenberg

Baltimore City – Property Tax Credit – Newly Constructed and Substantially Rehabilitated Dwellings
(Removed - 2/22/2021 1:40 PM)

Created: 2/19/2021 4:58 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Voting Session
7:45 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen King

Income Tax - Child Tax Credit and Expansion of the Earned Income Credit

Revenues Subcommittee - (Ways and Means Committee)
Created: 2/19/2021 4:58 PM
Revenues Subcommittee - Voting Session
5:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Subcommittee will meet at 5:30 or immediately following full committee bill hearings.”
Sen King

Income Tax - Child Tax Credit and Expansion of the Earned Income Credit

Click to return on the top page