Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Day(s)

As of: 5/24/2025 2:06:14 AM
Thursday, February 27, 2025
House
Created: 1/24/2025 11:05 AM
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
Tuesday, February 25, 2025 1:00 PM - Department of Legislative Services Building, Joint Hearing Room, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - Department of Legislative Services Building, Joint Hearing Room, Annapolis, MD
Joint with House Ways and Means
The Spkr (Admin)

Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2025
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Ways and Means)

Created: 2/17/2025 5:40 PM
Appropriations Committee
1:05 PM - Department of Legislative Services Building, Joint Hearing Room, Annapolis, MD
You will be called to testify once. BRFA witness sign-up is organized by topic. If you sign up for multiple topics, please address all of them when called.
Agriculture/Conservation/Environment/Natural Resources
Economic Development
Health - DDA
Health - Non-DDA
Higher Education/Scholarships
K-12 Education
Labor
OAG/VOCA/Public Safety
Other
Sports Wagering/Table Games
Taxation
Transportation

Click to return on the top page