Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/9/2022 9:39:54 PM
Tuesday, March 3, 2020
Senate
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 2/21/2020 10:28 AM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
EBA Decision Meeting

Health and Human Services Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 2/21/2020 10:28 AM
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:30 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
HHS Decision Meeting

Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 2/21/2020 10:28 AM
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
2:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
PSTE Decision Meeting

Capital Budget Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Canceled
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
2:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Capital Department of Public Safaty and Correctional Services
Capital University of Maryland, Baltimore
Capital University of Maryland, Baltimore
Capital University of Maryland, College Park
Capital Bowie State University
Capital Towson University
Capital University of Maryland Eastern Shore
Capital Frostburg State University
Capital Coppin State University
Capital Salisbury University
Capital University of Maryland, Baltimore County
Capital University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science
Capital University System of Maryland Office Capital

Created: 2/21/2020 10:28 AM
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
2:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Capital PAYGO Decision Meeting

Created: 2/20/2020 4:50 PM
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
3:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Capital Bowie State University
(Removed - 2/28/2020 5:33 PM)
Capital Frostburg State University
(Removed - 2/28/2020 5:33 PM)
Capital Towson University
(Removed - 2/28/2020 5:33 PM)
Capital University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science
(Removed - 2/28/2020 5:33 PM)
Capital University of Maryland, Baltimore
(Removed - 2/28/2020 5:33 PM)
Capital University of Maryland, Baltimore County
(Removed - 2/28/2020 5:33 PM)
Capital University of Maryland, College Park
(Removed - 2/28/2020 5:33 PM)

Created: 2/5/2020 4:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Washington, et al

State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach
Sen Young

Public School Students - Daily Physical Activity (Student Health and Fitness Act)
Sen Young, et al

Education - Public Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh Act)
Sen Gallion, et al

Public Schools - Flexible Instructional Days - Policy Requirements
Sen McCray

Education - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students - Report
Sen Hester

State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
Sen Klausmeier

State Department of Education - Financial Literacy Instruction - Reporting
Sen Klausmeier

Education - Comprehensive Health Education Program - Skin Cancer
Sen Lam

County Boards of Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
Sens Hershey and Rosapepe

County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority
Sen McCray, et al

Education - Alternative Schools - Reporting Requirements
Sen Hester

Public Schools – Mathematics Credit – Computer Science or Computer Programming Course
Sen Hester

County Boards of Education - Computer Science Courses
Sen Hester, et al

Public Schools – Agricultural Education and Grant Programs
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Jennings, et al

Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Firearms Required
(Removed - 2/6/2020 11:35 AM)
Sens Hester and Serafini

Education - Maryland Data Analysis and Accountability Program - Established
(Removed - 2/20/2020 11:36 AM)

Created: 2/7/2020 4:10 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
The Pres (Admin), et al

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program
(Added - 2/13/2020 9:27 AM)
Sen Feldman, et al

Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program
(Added - 2/13/2020 9:27 AM)
Sen Feldman

Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program - Establishment
(Added - 2/13/2020 9:27 AM)
Sen Feldman

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Partnership Program
(Added - 2/13/2020 9:27 AM)
Sen Klausmeier, et al

Labor and Employment - Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Revisions
Sen Klausmeier

Workers' Compensation - Fees for Legal Services
Sen Kelley, et al

Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Alterations and Task Force
Sen Feldman

Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 2/13/2020 9:27 AM)
The Pres (DLS)

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Revision
(Added - 2/13/2020 9:27 AM)
Sen Rosapepe

Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies
Sen Klausmeier

Workers' Compensation - Hernia Claims
Sen McCray

Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 2/13/2020 9:27 AM)
Sen Kramer

Commercial Law - Merchant Cash Advance - Prohibition
Sen Hayes

Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information
Sens Hershey and Kagan

Governmental Entities - Authorization to Bank With Credit Unions
Sen Klausmeier

Maryland Department of Labor - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Grants
(Removed - 3/2/2020 9:45 AM)
Sen Benson

Federal Energy Regulatory Commission Order
(Removed - 3/3/2020 10:30 AM)

Created: 2/6/2020 5:22 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
12:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Bill hearings will begin at 12:00 pm or immediately following the Senate floor session.
Sen Waldstreicher

Criminal Law - False Statements - Emergency or Commission of Crime
Sen Ready, et al

Criminal Law - Theft of a Handgun
Sen Edwards

Gun Theft Felony Act of 2020
Sen Carter, et al

Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia for Administration - Decriminalization
Sen Hough

Criminal Organizations - Penalties, Procedure, and Elements
Sen Patterson

Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Strategic Reentry Program
Sen Waldstreicher

Criminal Law - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Sens Kagan and Reilly (Com to Adv NG 911)

Criminal Law - Public Safety - Interference With Agencies and Services - Prohibitions
Sen Zucker, et al

Motor Vehicle Administration - Records - Voluntary Disclosure of Developmental Disability
Sens Beidle and West

Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Driver's License Verification and Records
Sens Ready and Hough

Criminal Law - Dangerous and Potentially Dangerous Dogs - Classification and Requirements
Sen Lee, et al

Criminal Law - Untraceable Firearms
Sens Carter and Smith

Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Complaints Against Law Enforcement Officers
(Added - 2/25/2020 10:32 AM)

Click to return on the top page