Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 6/28/2022 4:56:49 PM
Thursday, March 3, 2022
Senate
Created: 2/11/2022 12:59 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Waldstreicher

Medical Cannabis - Licensees - Ownership Limitation Exemption
Sen Patterson

Medical Cannabis - Grower License - Number and Licensed Processors
Sen Feldman

Cannabis - Regulation - Revisions
Sen Carter

Medical Cannabis – Dispensaries – Operation at Multiple Locations
Sen Carter

Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Feldman

Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)

Created: 2/25/2022 1:13 PM
Finance Committee - Voting Session
4:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Beidle, et al

State Finance and Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Stop Work Orders
(Added - 3/2/2022 5:40 PM)
Sen Carter

Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Safety Plans
(Added - 3/2/2022 5:40 PM)
Sen Lam, et al

Health Insurance - Prescription Insulin Drugs - Limits on Copayment and Coinsurance (Insulin Cost Reduction Act)
(Added - 3/2/2022 5:40 PM)
Sen Rosapepe, et al

Primary and Secondary Schools – Bus Driver Wages – Study
(Added - 3/2/2022 5:40 PM)
Sen Klausmeier

Insurance - Surplus Lines Brokers - Policy Fees
(Added - 3/2/2022 5:40 PM)
Sen Kelley, et al

Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Reporting Requirement
(Added - 3/2/2022 5:40 PM)
Sen Feldman

Public Utilities – Underground Facilities – One–Call System
(Added - 3/2/2022 5:40 PM)

Click to return on the top page