Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Day(s)

As of: 5/9/2025 8:22:12 AM
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
House
Created: 3/3/2025 9:22 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Sen M. Jackson, et al

Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officer or Rescue Worker - Alterations
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sens Brooks and Watson

Property Tax Credit - Retail Service Station Conversions
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen Corderman, et al

Property Tax - Credit for Law Enforcement Officer or Rescue Worker - Expansion to Judicial Officer
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen Carozza

Somerset County - Property Tax - Emergency Services Tax
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen Simonaire, et al

Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Supermarkets
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen Simonaire, et al

Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Habitat for Humanity of the Chesapeake, Incorporated
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/3/2025 10:20 AM)
Sen Kagan

General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen Kagan

Election Law - Campaign Finance - Exploratory Committees
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen Kagan, et al

Election Law - Municipal Elections - Administration
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/4/2025 2:54 PM)
Chr B&T (Dept)

State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Notification of Constant Yield Tax Rate - Alteration
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Chr B&T (Dept)

Property Tax - Deadline to Set County and Municipal Corporation Tax Rates - Alteration
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Election Law - Notice to Permanent Absentee Voters
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Election Plan Requirements
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Election Law - Special Elections
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Election Law - Petitions for the Formation of a New Political Party - Process
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/9/2025 2:47 PM)
Sen Kagan, et al

Education - Maryland Civic Excellence Program - Established
(Removed - 3/3/2025 10:51 AM)

Click to return on the top page