Day(s)
As of: 9/26/2024 6:04:42 PM
Created: 3/23/2021 6:22 AM
11:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Created: 3/10/2021 3:18 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Due to voting, today's bill hearings will begin at 2:00 p.m.
Sen Ellis
Housing and Community Development – Mortgage, Down Payment, and Settlement Expense Assistance
Sen Augustine
Health Occupations - Internship and Residency Training Requirements - Waiver for Former Service Members Injured in Combat
(Added - 3/16/2021 3:27 PM)
Sen Klausmeier (Dept)
Veterans Affairs – Office of Communications and Public Affairs – Veterans Advocacy and Education Act
(Added - 3/16/2021 3:27 PM)
(Added - 3/16/2021 3:27 PM)
Del Crosby
Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting
(Added - 3/17/2021 12:26 PM)
Sen Hester (Jt Cybscty Info BioTech Comm)
Department of Information Technology - Status of Information Technology and Cybersecurity in State and Local Agencies
(Removed - 3/23/2021 6:17 AM)
Wicomico County Senators
Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses – Hours
(Removed - 3/23/2021 6:17 AM)
(Added - 3/17/2021 5:19 PM)
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program MC 17-21
Del D. Barnes
Economic Development – Maryland Technology Development Corporation – Pre–Seed Builder Fund
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
Del Korman
Office of People's Counsel - Alterations (Office of People's Counsel Environmental Reform Act)
Del Wilson
Nursing Homes – Resident Change in Condition – Notification and Consultation With Physician
Del Guyton
State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs - Location and Funding
Del Lehman
Nursing Homes - COVID-19 and Other Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Visitation (The Gloria Daytz Lewis Act)
Del Crosby
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Credit Union Power
Del Cullison
Prescription Drug Affordability Board - Plan of Action - Repeal of Date for Submission
(Added - 3/17/2021 5:19 PM)
Created: 3/22/2021 3:54 PM
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 3/23/2021 11:22 AM)
Sen Rosapepe
Economic Development - COVID-19 Small Business Grant Program (COVID-19 Crisis Small Business Survival Program Act of 2021)
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 3/23/2021 9:28 AM)
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County – Residential Property Sales – School District Information MC 01-21
Del Barve
Real Property - Impermissible Restrictions on Use - Portable Basketball Apparatuses
(Added - 3/22/2021 2:58 PM)
Created: 3/23/2021 11:42 AM
2:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sponsor hearings of bills for rereferrals
Created: 3/16/2021 10:51 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Kramer
Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores – Modifications (No More Puppy– and Kitten–Mills Act of 2021)
Chr EHE (Dept)
State Board of Public Accountancy – Education Requirements – Obsolete References
Sen Cassilly
Lodging Establishments – Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities – Deadlines
Created: 3/22/2021 12:54 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Canceled
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Work Session
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/17/2021 7:27 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Please note that the House will not hold hearing on identically crossfiled bills, per guidance listed on the homepage of the MGA website.
Sen McCray
Public Health – Behavioral Health Programs and Health Care Facilities – Safety and Community Relations Plans
Sen Griffith, et al
Public Health - Implicit Bias Training and the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:39 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:39 PM)
Sen Augustine
Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent (Mental Health Access Initiative)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:39 PM)
Sen Washington
Public Health – Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan–Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:39 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:39 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:39 PM)
Sen Kramer
Health Care Facilities – Dialysis Treatment Services – Training (David Selby Dialysis Parity Act)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:39 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:39 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:39 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:39 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:39 PM)
Sen Carter, et al
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:39 PM)
Sen Washington
Maryland Department of Health - Public Health Outreach Programs - Cognitive Impairment, Alzheimer's Disease, and Other Types of Dementia
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:39 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:39 PM)
Sen West
Mental Health - Assent to and Certificates for Admission - Licensed Certified Social Worker-Clinical and Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:39 PM)
Sen Klausmeier
Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements - Children and Young Adults - Report Modifications
(Removed - 3/20/2021 3:39 PM)
Created: 3/23/2021 10:06 AM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Kelly
Health Information Exchanges - Electronic Health Information - Sharing and Disclosure
(Added - 3/23/2021 1:26 PM)
Sen Eckardt
Certified Nursing Assistants – Certificate Renewal – Training Program Requirements
(Added - 3/23/2021 1:26 PM)
(Added - 3/23/2021 1:26 PM)
Sen Simonaire
Funeral Establishments and Crematories – Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans – Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
(Added - 3/23/2021 1:26 PM)
(Added - 3/23/2021 1:26 PM)
Sen Eckardt
Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
(Added - 3/23/2021 1:26 PM)
Sen Hester, et al
Maryland Department of Health – Residential Service Agencies – Training Requirements
Sen Kagan
State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Ways and Means)
Sen Washington
Maryland Department of Health - Public Health Outreach Programs - Cognitive Impairment, Alzheimer's Disease, and Other Types of Dementia
Sen West
Mental Health - Assent to and Certificates for Admission - Licensed Certified Social Worker-Clinical and Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor
(Added - 3/23/2021 1:26 PM)
Sen Augustine
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Prophylaxis Care and Oral Health Exams
Sen Klausmeier
Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements - Children and Young Adults - Report Modifications
Sen Hershey
Pharmacists - Required Notification and Authorized Substitution - Lower-Cost Drug or Device Product
Sen Beidle, et al
Sheila E. Hixson Behavioral Health Services Matching Grant Program for Service Members and Veterans – Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Appropriations)
Sens Smith and Carozza
Procurement – Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Reserve Program and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Program
(Added - 3/23/2021 1:26 PM)
Sens Carozza and Kagan
Alcohol and Drug Counseling - Alcohol and Drug Trainees - Practice Through Telehealth
Sen Feldman
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – State–Based Young Adult Health Insurance Subsidies Pilot Program
Sen Zucker, et al
2-1-1 Maryland - Mental Health Services Phone Call Program (The Thomas Bloom Raskin Act)
Sen Lam
Secretary of Health - School-Based Health Centers - Guidelines and Administration of Grants
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Ways and Means)
Created: 3/22/2021 1:05 PM
11:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- HB 1375
Canceled
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
*The following bills are SPONSOR-ONLY: SB 14, SB 43, SB 220
Sen Kelley, et al
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
Sens Elfreth and Hettleman
Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
Created: 3/1/2021 9:08 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
All Hearing on Senate Bills are Sponsor Only.
(Added - 3/12/2021 9:16 AM)
(Added - 3/12/2021 9:16 AM)
(Added - 3/22/2021 11:22 AM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 1:09 PM)
Sen McCray
Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force
(Removed - 3/20/2021 1:09 PM)
Sen Elfreth (AA Co Admin)
Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
(Removed - 3/20/2021 1:09 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 1:09 PM)