Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 11/30/2022 12:19:34 PM
Wednesday, March 23, 2022
Senate
Created: 3/14/2022 3:54 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sponsor Only
Del Clippinger

Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Adult Use and Possession
Del Pena-Melnyk, et al

Secretary of Health - Professional Qualification Requirement
(Added - 3/16/2022 7:07 PM)
Del Clippinger

Cannabis Reform
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)

Created: 3/16/2022 7:07 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:15 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Del Watson

Unemployment Insurance – Recovery of Benefits – Refund of Payments
Del Chang

Maryland Stadium Authority - Membership
Del Amprey

Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, and Other Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals

Created: 3/23/2022 10:00 AM
Finance Committee - Voting Session
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Kelley, et al

State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators – Renaming and Licensure of Assisted Living Managers
Sen Benson

Maryland School for the Deaf – Professional Personnel and Staff – Service Designation, Assignment, and Placement in a Collective Bargaining Unit

Click to return on the top page