Day(s)
As of: 9/26/2024 6:03:42 PM
The Spkr
Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering
Sponsor Only
(Added - 3/17/2021 1:06 PM)
Sponsor Only
(Added - 3/17/2021 1:06 PM)
Del Feldmark, et al
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Qualified Position and Revitalization Area
Sponsor Only
(Added - 3/17/2021 1:06 PM)
Del Boyce
Property Tax Credit - Urban Agricultural Property - Repeal of Repayment Requirement
Sponsor Only
(Added - 3/17/2021 1:06 PM)
St. Mary's County Delegation
St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax
Sponsor Only
(Added - 3/17/2021 1:06 PM)
Sponsor Only
(Added - 3/17/2021 1:06 PM)
Del Shoemaker
State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Application of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemption
Sponsor Only
(Added - 3/17/2021 1:06 PM)
Sponsor Only
(Added - 3/17/2021 1:06 PM)
Capital Budget Subcommittee reports its budget decisions to Full Committee and committee vote on HB590
Created: 3/22/2021 2:03 PM
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
1:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
3:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Decisions
Created: 3/24/2021 7:18 PM
9:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Created: 3/18/2021 2:52 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Guyton
Family Child Care Homes, Large Family Child Care Homes, and Child Care Centers - Early Childhood Screening and Assistance
Del Rosenberg
Election Law – Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems – Notification and Termination of Contract
Del Wilson
Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
Sponsor testimony only.
(Added - 3/24/2021 9:12 AM)
Sponsor only testimony
(Added - 3/23/2021 2:58 PM)
Del Ebersole
State Department of Education - Infant and Early Childhood Mental Health Consultation Project - Study and Report
Del Charkoudian
Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits
Created: 3/24/2021 4:25 PM
1:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Created: 3/9/2021 2:50 PM
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
1:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Stewart
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2021)
(Added - 3/16/2021 2:09 PM)
(Added - 3/16/2021 2:09 PM)
Del Qi
State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Lists of Business Entities Not Filing Annual Report
(Added - 3/15/2021 1:26 PM)
(Added - 3/15/2021 1:26 PM)
Created: 3/25/2021 12:01 PM
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Police Reform
Created: 3/25/2021 9:58 AM
10:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Immediately after the floor session
Created: 3/12/2021 2:33 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Edwards, et al
Public Ethics - Officials and Employees - Acceptance of Gifts and Prohibited Retaliation
Sen McCray
Maryland Transit Administration – Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Program Patients – Program Requirements
Created: 3/17/2021 6:16 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Please note that the House will not hold hearings on identically crossfilled bills, per guidance listed on the homepage of the MGA website. SB 84, 120, and 298 will be sponsor only. Final bill order below.
Sens Young and Waldstreicher
Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
(Added - 3/22/2021 4:14 PM)
Sen Reilly
State Board of Pharmacy – Pharmacy Closure – Notice to Customers (The Dennis Robin Act)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 4:05 PM)
Sen Eckardt
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination
(Removed - 3/20/2021 4:05 PM)
Sen Augustine
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
(Removed - 3/20/2021 4:05 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 4:05 PM)
Sen Kagan
State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
(Removed - 3/20/2021 4:05 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 4:05 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 4:05 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 4:05 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 4:05 PM)
Sen Augustine, et al
Maryland Insurance Commissioner – Specialty Mental Health Services and Payment of Claims – Enforcement
(Removed - 3/20/2021 4:05 PM)
(Removed - 3/20/2021 4:05 PM)
Created: 3/22/2021 4:05 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- HB 652, HB 708, HB 1030, SB 125, and SB 247
(Added - 3/24/2021 3:04 PM)
- HB 652, SB 82, and SB 125
(Removed - 3/24/2021 9:22 AM)
- HB 652, HB 708, HB 1030, SB 82, SB 125, and SB 247
(Removed - 3/24/2021 3:04 PM)
Created: 3/12/2021 5:48 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Per the Opposite Chamber Bill Hearing Guidelines: All committees in the House of Delegates will not hold hearings on identically crossfiles bills. Bills with significant changes and non-crossfiled legislaton will generally have sponsor only hearings but may not add witnesses at thr discretion of the Chair. The bills listed below will receive hearings with witnesses added and the selected witnesses will receive a Zoom link to attend the hearing.
Sen Smith
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Office of the State Prosecutor - Investigation and Prosecution of Deaths Caused by Police Officers
Sen Carter
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Personnel Records - Investigations of Law Enforcement Officers (Anton's Law)
Sen Carter
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force, Reporting, and Whistleblower Protections
Sen Carter
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Repeal and Procedures for Discipline
Sen Washington, et al
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Employee Assistance Programs and Early Intervention Programs
Sen McCray (BCA)
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Baltimore City - Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City
Created: 3/1/2021 2:37 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
All hearings on Senate Bills are Sponsor Only.
Sen Ferguson
Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax and Tobacco Tax - Alterations and Implementation
(Added - 3/9/2021 11:51 AM)
Sen Eckardt
Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages - Eligibility and Sunset Repeal
Sen Eckardt
Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Sen Gallion, et al
Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas
Sen Simonaire
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - Sale of Sewing Items
Chr B&T (Dept)
Economic Development – Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program – Alterations
Chr B&T (Dept)
Economic Development – Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program – Expansion and Extension
(Removed - 3/22/2021 9:34 AM)
(Removed - 3/22/2021 9:34 AM)
Sens McCray and Elfreth
Board of Revenue Estimates and Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Organization and Operations
(Removed - 3/22/2021 9:34 AM)
Sen Edwards
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Certified Historic Structure and Single–Family, Owner–Occupied Residence – Definitions
(Removed - 3/22/2021 9:34 AM)
Sen Guzzone
Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund - Advisory Committee Membership and Registration of Horses
(Removed - 3/22/2021 9:34 AM)
(Removed - 3/22/2021 9:34 AM)
(Removed - 3/22/2021 9:34 AM)
Sens Zucker and Elfreth
Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Tax Incidence Study - Scope and Intergovernmental Assistance
(Removed - 3/22/2021 9:34 AM)
Sen Edwards
Task Force on the Economic Future of Western Maryland - Extension of Report Deadline and Task Force
(Removed - 3/22/2021 9:34 AM)
Sen McCray
Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force
Wicomico County Senators
Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development
Created: 3/23/2021 12:14 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Work session will be held immediately after the Committee Bill Hearings. All Bills will be discussion only.
Weekly Meeting of the Harford County House Delegation.