Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Day(s)

As of: 4/28/2025 2:08:30 AM
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
House
Created: 3/19/2025 6:00 PM
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
2:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Sen Guzzone

Maryland Community Action Agencies - Funding
Sen Guzzone, et al

Governor's Office for Children - Boys and Girls Clubs of Maryland - Grant Funding
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Maryland Higher Education Commission - Academic Program Approval - Revisions
Chr FIN (Dept)

State Government - Public Employee Relations Act - Alterations
Sen Lam (Joint Audit and Evaluation Commi

Higher Education - High Impact Economic Development Activities - Alterations
Sens Hettleman and Guzzone

Access to Counsel in Evictions - Task Force and Special Fund
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Judiciary)
Sen Hershey

School Construction - Local Cost-Share - Alterations
Sen Jennings

Local Government – Local Personnel – Leave With Pay
Sen M. Jackson

Calvert County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Deputies - Collective Bargaining
Sen M. Washington, et al

Higher Education - Hunger-Free Campus Grant Program - Alterations
Sen Charles

Department of Human Services - Study on Private Treatment Foster Care Homes
Sen Folden

Education - Safe Schools Fund - Grant Allocations
Sen Lewis Young, et al

Higher Education - Janet L. Hoffman Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Eligibility
Sen Kramer

Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Revisions (Davis Martinez Public Employee Safety and Health Act)
Howard County Senators

Howard Community College - Board of Trustees, Meetings, and Contracts - Alterations Ho. Co. 1-25
Del Harris

Collective Bargaining - Local Government Employees and Public Employee Relations Act
(Added - 3/24/2025 12:04 PM)
Sen Kramer

State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Part-Time Faculty
(Removed - 3/21/2025 11:52 AM)

Click to return on the top page