Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Day(s)

As of: 4/17/2025 3:21:44 PM
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
House
Created: 3/13/2025 1:16 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Written testimony will be accepted for all bills
Sens Simonaire and Jackson

Maryland Department of Labor - Licenses - Notation of Veteran Status and Eligibility for Benefits
(Added - 3/19/2025 4:47 PM)
Sen Ellis

State Board of Public Accountancy - Emeritus Status
The Bill is Sponsor Only
(Added - 3/20/2025 9:46 AM)
Chr FIN (Dept)

Uninsured Employers' Fund - Assessments and Special Monitor
(Added - 3/19/2025 4:47 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept)

Workers' Compensation - Payment From Uninsured Employers' Fund - Revisions
(Added - 3/19/2025 4:47 PM)
Sen McCray

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Operation Violations - Civil Penalties
Sen Beidle

Workers' Compensation - Prescription Drug and Pharmaceutical Services - Reimbursements
(Added - 3/19/2025 4:47 PM)
Sen Beidle

Labor and Employment - Uninsured Employers' Fund Board - Membership and Reserves
(Added - 3/19/2025 4:47 PM)
Sen Gile

Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing Programs - Insurance and Liability
(Added - 3/19/2025 4:47 PM)
Sen Watson, et al

Occupational Licensing and Certification - Criminal History - Prohibited Disclosures
(Added - 3/19/2025 4:47 PM)
Sen Hayes

Workers' Compensation - Claims Application Form - Authorization for Release of Information
(Added - 3/19/2025 4:47 PM)
Sen Hettleman

Business Regulation - Cellular Phone Carriers - Authorized Users
(Added - 3/19/2025 4:47 PM)
Sen A. Washington

Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Programs That Measure the Operation of an Insured Vehicle
(Added - 3/19/2025 4:47 PM)

Created: 3/24/2025 4:25 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Work Session
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Work Session discussing Amendments to HB1035, HB1036, HB1037

Click to return on the top page