Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Day(s)

As of: 4/24/2025 4:55:31 PM
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
Senate
Created: 3/18/2025 2:29 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
The Spkr

Department of Social and Economic Mobility - Established
Limited testimony of 2 proponents and 2 opponents. Written testimony welcom.
Del A. Jones

Barbers and Cosmetologists - License Qualifications - Domestic Violence Awareness Training
Sponsor only
Chr ECM (Dept)

Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund and Customer-Sited Solar Program - Alterations
(Added - 3/20/2025 12:46 PM)
Del Charkoudian

Public Utilities - Transmission Lines - Advanced Transmission Technologies
Limited testimony of 2 proponents and 2 opponents. Written testimony welcome.
Del Stein

Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, or Refrigeration Contractors - Equipment Sales
Limited testimony of 2 proponents and 2 opponents. Written testimony welcome.

Created: 3/26/2025 10:01 AM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
1:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Hester

Energy Resource Adequacy and Planning Act
(Added - 3/26/2025 11:34 AM)

Click to return on the top page