Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Day(s)

As of: 4/28/2025 2:05:38 AM
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
House
Created: 3/19/2025 1:49 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Written testimony will be accepted for all bills.
Sen M. Jackson

Environment - Coal Combustion By-Products - Fees, Coordinating Committee, and Regulations
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters) This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen Guzzone

Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program - Funding
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Health and Government Operations) This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen Hester

Department of the Environment - Community Water and Sewerage Systems - Cybersecurity Planning and Assessments
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Health and Government Operations) This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen Hester

Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Septic System Upgrade Program
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen M. Washington

Environment - Interjurisdictional Watersheds - Flood Management
Sen Simonaire, et al

Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program - Renaming
Sens Simonaire and Jackson

Department of the Environment - Notation of Veteran Status
Sen Simonaire

Boating Accidents - Reporting Requirement - Property Damage
Sen Simonaire

Agriculture - Departmental Authority Over Identification, Inspection, and Sale of Cantaloupes - Repeal
Sen Simonaire

Confined Aquatic Disposal Cells - Construction - Moratorium
Sen Simonaire, et al

Recreational Equality for Service Members Act
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen Bailey

Natural Resources - State Boat Act - Auctioneers
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sens Bailey and Mautz

Natural Resources - Invasive Blue Catfish Pilot Program
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen Bailey

Maryland Agricultural and Resource-Based Industry Development Corporation - Oyster Shucking House Loan Program
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sens Bailey and Mautz

Natural Resources - Canada Geese - Bag Limits
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Chr FIN (Dept)

Maryland Farms and Families Fund - Purpose and Use - Alterations
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Department of Agriculture – Maryland Agricultural Commission and Young Farmers
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Pesticide and Pest Control - Revisions to Pesticide Applicator's Law and Repeal of Obsolete Provisions
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Plant Disease Control - Nurseries - Inspection, Certification, and Licensing Fees
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Controlled Hazardous Substance Facility Permit - Research Facilities - Chemical Warfare Material Requirements
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Natural Resources - Fishing Licenses and Stamps - Alterations
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Environment - Reservoir Augmentation Permit - Establishment
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sens Brooks and Kagan

Maryland Environmental Service - Membership of Board of Directors - Alterations
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen Kramer

Crimes Relating to Animals - Restrictions on Keeping Roosters
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Frederick County Senators

Frederick and Washington Counties - Bow Hunting - Openly Carrying Handguns
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sens Corderman and M. Jackson

Natural Resources - Maryland Heritage Areas Authority - Funding and Grants
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Washington County Senators

Washington County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sens Henson and Augustine

Department of the Environment - Definition of Ecological Restoration
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen Carozza, et al

Endangered and Threatened Species - Incidental Taking - Bats
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Dorchester County Senators

Dorchester County - Well and On-Site Sewage Disposal Activities - Privatization Program
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen Gile

Natural Resources - Vessels - Carbon Monoxide Warning Labels (Matthew's Law)
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Department of the Environment - Fees, Penalties, Funding, and Regulation
(Removed - 3/20/2025 9:21 AM)
Sen Augustine, et al

Environment - Packaging and Paper Products - Producer Responsibility Plans
(Removed - 3/20/2025 9:21 AM)
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Agriculture - Soil Conservation and Water Quality Plan - Uses of Information
(Removed - 3/25/2025 3:30 PM)

Environment Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Created: 3/24/2025 6:52 PM
Environment Subcommittee - Work Session
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The exact start time will be announced after bill hearings. Agenda

Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Created: 3/24/2025 1:00 PM
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
Thursday, March 27, 2025 3:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
3:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The exact time will be announced after bill hearings. Agenda

Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Created: 3/24/2025 6:54 PM
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Work Session
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The exact start time will be announced after bill hearings. Agenda

Click to return on the top page