Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Day(s)

As of: 4/18/2025 12:25:38 AM
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
Senate
Created: 3/18/2025 3:26 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
All bills are sponsor only EXCEPT HB 813 and HB 1292
Allegany County Delegation

Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Minimum Age for Employment of Underage Individuals
Del Kipke

Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Licenses - Events
Del Kipke

Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Special Event Permit
Baltimore County Delegation

Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Transfers
Baltimore County Delegation

Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-OB-CRD (Office Building - Commercial Revitalization District) Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Baltimore County Delegation

Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Change of Location
Baltimore County Delegation

Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Waiting Period After License Denial
Harford County Delegation

Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alteration of License Quota
Howard County Delegation

Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon and Barbershop License MC 3-25
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BD-BWL Licenses - Multiple Licenses MC 18-25
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Health and Safety MC 21-25
St. Mary's County Delegation

St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A License Quota
St. Mary's County Delegation

St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Penalty for Sales Violations
St. Mary's County Delegation

St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Multiple Licensing Plans
Del Otto, et al

Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Tasting License
Del Guyton, et al

Maryland Transit Administration - Disability Reduced Fare Program - Renewal for Permanently Disabled Individuals
(Added - 3/20/2025 11:25 AM)
Del S. Johnson, et al

Maryland Insurance Administration and Maryland Department of Health - Workgroup to Study Pharmacy Benefits Managers
(Added - 3/21/2025 3:59 PM)
Del Martinez, et al

Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Coverage for Anesthesia - Prohibiting Time Limitations
(Added - 3/20/2025 11:25 AM)
Del Kaiser, et al

Health Insurance - Provider Directory - Required Updates
(Added - 3/20/2025 11:25 AM)
Del Rosenberg, et al

Maryland Medical Assistance Program, Maryland Children’s Health Program, and Health Insurance – Transfers to Special Pediatric Hospitals – Prior Authorizations
(Added - 3/20/2025 11:25 AM)
Del Miller, et al

Health Care - Prior Authorizations - Prohibiting Fees
(Added - 3/20/2025 11:25 AM)
Del Ghrist, et al

Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Credentialing for Behavioral Health Care Professionals
(Added - 3/20/2025 11:25 AM)
Chr HGO (Dept)

Department of Aging – Aging Services – Program Repeal and Consolidation
(Removed - 3/21/2025 11:36 AM)

Click to return on the top page