Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Day(s)

As of: 4/26/2025 8:37:38 AM
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
House
Created: 3/17/2025 6:19 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
All bills are sponsor only unless otherwise noted. Bill order has been updated.
Sen Ellis

Opioid Restitution Fund - Authorized Uses
Sen Augustine

Maryland Department of Health - Forensic Review Board - Established
Sen Augustine

Behavioral Health Advisory Council and the Commission on Behavioral Health Care Treatment and Access - Plan to Implement Early and Periodic Screening, Diagnostic, and Treatment Requirements
Sen Augustine

Maryland Behavioral Health Crisis Response System - Integration of 9-8-8 Suicide and Crisis Lifeline Network and Outcome Evaluations
Sen Guzzone

Public Health Abortion Grant Program - Establishment
(Added - 3/24/2025 10:27 AM)
Sen Gile

Education and Health - Emergency Use Epinephrine - Alterations
(Removed - 3/26/2025 10:36 AM)

Created: 3/26/2025 10:24 AM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD

Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 3/18/2025 3:50 PM
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
SBs 48, 172, and 182
(Added - 3/25/2025 10:30 AM)
HB 738
(Added - 3/25/2025 10:30 AM)
SBs 48, 172, and 182
(Removed - 3/25/2025 10:30 AM)

Click to return on the top page