Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Day(s)

As of: 4/24/2025 5:09:01 PM
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
House
Created: 3/17/2025 11:49 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
2:15 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Sen Benson, et al

Education - Student Personal Electronic Device Use Policy - Required
(Added - 3/18/2025 9:23 AM)
Sen Watson, et al

Public Libraries - Automated External Defibrillator Program (Raymono A. Russell Act)
(Added - 3/18/2025 9:23 AM)
Carroll County Senators

Carroll County Board of Education - Vacancy Procedures - Alterations
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen Kramer

Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Notice to Request Application
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sen M. Washington

Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audits - Risk-Limiting Audits
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sen Hester

Election Law - Influence on a Voter's Voting Decision By Use of Fraud - Prohibition
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sen Rosapepe, et al

Property Tax - Property Adjacent to Rail Stations - Subclasses and Special Rates
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Environment and Transportation) This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sen Jennings

Manufacturing Business Personal Property Tax - Optional Exemption
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sen King, et al

Property Tax - Day Care Centers, Child Care Homes, and Child Care Centers
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sens McCray and Hayes

Baltimore City - Property Tax - Authority to Establish a Subclass and Special Rate for Vacant Property Owned by Nonprofit Organizations
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Washington County Senators

Washington County - Property Tax - Multi-Use Facilities and Economic Development Projects
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sens Hershey and Zucker

Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Broadband Service Providers
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sen Attar, et al

Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals - Alteration
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sen Brooks

Education - Dependent Children of Service Members - Advance Enrollment Procedures
Sen Brooks, et al

County Boards of Education - Special Education Service Delivery Models - Publication Requirement
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen Brooks, et al

Workgroup on Mail-In Ballot Accessibility
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sen Hettleman

Affordable Housing Payment In Lieu of Taxes Expansion Act
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Environment and Transportation) This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sen Hettleman

Property Tax – Low–Income Housing Tax Credit – Valuation of Property
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sen Hettleman

Local Education Agencies - Educator Screening - Educator Identification Clearinghouse (School Personnel Vetting and Hiring Transparency Act)
(Added - 3/18/2025 9:23 AM)
Sen Kagan

Elections - Local Boards of Elections - Open Meeting Requirements (Local Boards of Elections Transparency Act)
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sens Kagan and Gallion

Election Law - Election Judges - Compensation
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sen Kagan

Election Law - Provisional Ballots - Nonpartisan Board of Education Contests
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sen Kagan

Election Law - Petitions and Ballot Questions - Contents, Plain Language Requirement, and Procedures
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sen Kagan

Campaign Finance - Political Organizations - Disclosures on Solicitations (Stop Scam PACs Act)
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sen Kagan

Election Law - Gubernatorial Primary Election - Date
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sen Simonaire, et al

Educational Equality for Service Members Act
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Appropriations) This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen Simonaire, et al

Election Law – Chief Election Judges – Party Affiliation
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sen Simonaire

Education - Youth Suicide Prevention School Program - Revisions
(Added - 3/18/2025 9:23 AM)
Sen Gile, et al

Public Schools - High School Sports Officiating Services - Procurement Requirements
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Health and Government Operations) This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
Sen Gile

Public Schools and Youth Services - Crisis Support and Assistance and Workgroup Study
(Added - 3/18/2025 9:23 AM)
Sen Sydnor, et al

Voting Rights Act of 2025 - Counties and Municipal Corporations
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)
Sen Salling, et al

Baltimore County - Republican Party Central Committee - Elections
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony.
(Added - 3/25/2025 4:31 PM)

Click to return on the top page