Day(s)
As of: 4/27/2024 9:30:27 AM
Created: 3/16/2024 11:31 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Special Witness Guidelines
All bills are sponsor only unless otherwise noted. Bill order has been updated for the hearing.
All bills are sponsor only unless otherwise noted. Bill order has been updated for the hearing.
Sen Beidle, et al
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Coverage for Prostheses (So Every Body Can Move Act)
(Added - 3/19/2024 3:36 PM)
Sen Hettleman
Assisted Living Programs - Assisted Living Referrers - Requirements and Prohibitions
(Added - 3/19/2024 3:36 PM)
Sen Hester, et al
Information Technology - Artificial Intelligence - Policies and Procedures (Artificial Intelligence Governance Act of 2024)
(Added - 3/20/2024 11:15 AM)
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Appropriations)
(Added - 3/20/2024 11:15 AM)
(Added - 3/19/2024 3:36 PM)
Sen Hershey
Health Benefit Plans - Calculation of Cost Sharing Contribution - Requirements and Prohibitions
(Added - 3/26/2024 10:11 AM)
Chr FIN (Dept)
State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Sunset Extension
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
Chr FIN (Dept)
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Behavior Analyst Advisory Committee - Sunset Extension
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
Created: 3/21/2024 3:29 PM
11:00 AM
-
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Or immediately after floor.
HB1263, SBs 222, 224, 236, 239, and 257
(Added - 3/25/2024 3:12 PM)
SBs 222, 224, 236, 239, and 257
(Removed - 3/25/2024 3:12 PM)