Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/24/2024 10:32:55 PM
Tuesday, April 2, 2024
House
Created: 3/21/2024 3:37 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
All hearings are sponsor only unless otherwise indicated. Written testimony may be submitted.
Sen McKay

Garrett County - Sheriff's Salary - Alteration
Sen Augustine

Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Laws
Sen Augustine

Prince George's Gateway Development Authority - Modifications
Oral testimony will be accepted on this bill.
(Added - 3/26/2024 10:20 AM)
Sen Augustine, et al

Housing and Community Development - Conversion of Commercial Buildings for Residential Use - Report
Oral testimony will be accepted on this bill.
Frederick County Senators

Sheriff of Frederick County - Salary - Workgroup
(Added - 3/26/2024 11:02 AM)
Anne Arundel County Senators

Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary
Sen Charles

Maryland Condominium Act - Amendments to the Declaration
Oral testimony will be accepted on this bill.
Sen Hayes

Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program - Alterations
Sens Guzzone and Benson

Local Government - Annual Audit Reporting Requirements - Alterations
Sen Carozza

Somerset County – Sale of Property – Revells Neck Road
Sen Carozza

Somerset County - Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services
Sen Carozza

Somerset County - Fire Companies - Appropriations
Dorchester County Delegation

Dorchester County - County Property Leases - Notice Exemptions
Oral testimony will be accepted on this bill.
(Added - 3/28/2024 11:02 AM)
Sen Mautz

Dorchester County - County Property Leases - Notice Exemptions
(Added - 3/28/2024 11:02 AM)
Sens Gallion and Folden

Vehicle Laws - Lighting - Privately Owned Vehicles
Sen McCray

Transportation - MobilityLink Paratransit Service Improvements - Study
Sen Lewis Young

Wildlife – Protections and Highway Crossings
Sens Kelly and Lam

Vehicle Laws - Bus Obstruction Monitoring Systems (Better Bus Service Act of 2024)
Oral testimony will be accepted on this bill.
Sen Carter

Maryland Building Performance Standards - Local Requests for Guidance - Religious Considerations
Sen West, et al

Baltimore County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Interstate 695
Oral testimony will be accepted on this bill.
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Sustainable Growth Subcabinet and Repeal of the Office of Smart Growth
(Added - 3/25/2024 3:50 PM)

Created: 3/29/2024 3:28 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Created: 4/1/2024 11:58 AM
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Canceled
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - Work Session
12:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page