Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/24/2024 9:34:36 PM
Tuesday, April 2, 2024
House
Created: 3/21/2024 3:49 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
1:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
All bills are sponsor only, unless otherwise noted. Bill order has been updated for hearing.
Sen Smith, et al

Emergency Services - Automated External Defibrillator and Naloxone Co-Location Initiative - Requirements for Public Buildings
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
(Added - 3/25/2024 12:43 PM)
Sens Klausmeier and Ellis

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Employed Individuals With Disabilities
(Added - 3/25/2024 2:27 PM)
Sen Lam

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Personal Care Aides - Wage Reports
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
(Added - 3/25/2024 2:27 PM)
Sens Lam and McKay

Maryland Pathway to Nursing Pilot Program and Advisory Committee - Establishment
Sen M. Washington

Workgroup for the Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard of Hearing - Established
Sen Ellis, et al

Hospitals - Care of Infants After Discharge (Safe Sleep Act of 2024)
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
(Added - 3/25/2024 4:04 PM)
Sen Ellis

State Designations - State Fruit - American Persimmon
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
Sen Hayes

Hospitals - Medical Debt Collection - Sale of Patient Debt
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
(Added - 3/25/2024 12:43 PM)
Sen Hester

Economic Development – Cyber Maryland Fund and Program – Alterations
Sen Simonaire, et al

General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Maryland Veterans Suicide Prevention Day
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
Sen Simonaire, et al

Maryland Disability Service Animal Program - Established
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
(Added - 3/25/2024 12:43 PM)

Created: 4/2/2024 12:02 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
3:15 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 4/1/2024 9:27 AM
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Work Session
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
12:45 PM - Zoom / YouTube
HBs 986 and 1472
SBs 117, 245, 578, 594, and 991
(Added - 4/1/2024 3:17 PM)
SBs 117, 245, 594, and 991
(Removed - 4/1/2024 3:17 PM)

Click to return on the top page